California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 2:24-cv-00854
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
22 22 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Fri 08/30 7:26 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals19 filed by Keith Wesley Edwards. CCA # 24-4066 The order warned appellant that failure to comply would result in the dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk of the Court. To date, appellant has not complied with the courts order. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. This order served on the district court will, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
21 21 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Fri 07/05 9:35 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 24-4066 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals19 as to petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
20 20 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Thu 06/27 6:42 AM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals19 . (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
19 19 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Thu 06/27 6:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. Appeal of Judgment,14 Filed On: 6/13/24; Entered On: 6/13/24; Filing fee $ 605. Billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
18 18 order For Order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 06/25 7:32 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers): by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Petitioner paid the filing fee for this action on February 28, 2024. (Docket No. 7). Accordingly, his request to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No.17 ) - mailed before judgment was entered is DENIED as moot. Additionally, as requested by Petitioner (Docket No.16 ), the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send with this Order a printed copy of the docket for this case. (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
17 17 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/14 9:42 AM
APPLICATION For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (et)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs motion Order Thu 06/13 2:25 PM
REQUEST for Copy of Docketing Sheet filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/13 2:24 PM
Notice of Constitutional Violation Inmate held Without Jurisdiction filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
14 14 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 06/13 2:23 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu, Related to: Order Dismissing Case,13 . Pursuant to the Order Summarily Dismissing Petition Without Prejudice, IT IS ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as improperly brought in habeas corpus. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Dismissing Case Thu 06/13 2:20 PM
Order Summarily Dismissing Petition Without Prejudice by Judge Wesley L. Hsu, re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),1 . The Petition is dismissed without prejudice to filing an appropriate challenge in his criminal case. Petitioner is not required to obtain a certificate of appealability to appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. See Harrison v. Ollison, 519 F.3d 952, 958 (9th Cir. 2008). (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
12 12 motion (TERMED) Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/08 2:23 PM
OBJECTION to Order to Show Cause9 and Request for Extension to Respond filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es) Modified on 4/8/2024 (es)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/08 2:14 PM
Notice of Filing Error filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/01 4:23 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within twenty-eight (28) days why the Petition should not be dismissed. Petitioner's response should cite to applicable legal authority. Petitioner's failure to act by the deadline may result in dismissal. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/29 4:23 PM
Petitioner's NOTICE of Defective Indictment filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
7 7 misc Financial Entry Wed 02/28 10:00 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Keith Wesley Edwards. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),1 . Receipt number 13990. (fa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 attorney Change of Address Wed 02/28 7:51 AM
NOTICE of Change of address Changing petitioners address to 215 N. 3rd Street, Chickasha OK 73018 Filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
5 5 6 pgs motion Order Tue 02/13 2:41 PM
REQUEST for Undefined Term to be Defined filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Thu 02/01 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
2 2 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111) Thu 02/01 11:59 AM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),1 .(ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-60P
Monday, January 29, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/02 4:33 PM
NOTICE filed by Petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Thu 02/01 11:56 AM
(PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Wesley L. Hsu and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F McCormick.(Filing fee $ 5:FEE DUE), filed by petitioner Keith Wesley Edwards. (ghap)
Related: [-]