California Central District Court
Judge:Valerie Baker Fairbank
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 5:24-cv-00177
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
California State License Board Swift
Defendant
City of San Bernardino
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Employment Development Department
Defendant
Teresa Garcia
Defendant
Sandra Mendez
Plaintiff
Richard P. Avila
an individual 4022 North F Street
San Bernardino, CA 92407


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 08/26 11:56 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,8 IT IS ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (rolm)
Related: [-]
8 8 order R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations Mon 08/26 11:55 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank for Report and Recommendation (Issued)7 . IT IS ORDERED that Judgment be entered dismissing this action without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
7 7 reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Issued) Tue 07/02 11:50 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re Complaint1 (hr)
Related: [-]
6 6 reportrecommend Notice of Report and Recommendation Tue 07/02 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2024. (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report and Recommendation
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 05/15 11:00 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before June 13, 2024, why the Court should not recommend that the action be dismissed under Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Rights Complaint Form,
Att: 2 Notice of Dismissal Form
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 13 pgs order Order Mon 04/01 3:42 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Complaint1 . The Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order within which to file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC"). (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Rights Complaint Form,
Att: 2 Notice of Dismissal Form
Thursday, February 01, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 02/01 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
2 2 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 02/01 10:22 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - Related [+],1 .The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sh)
Related: [-] ferred
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Thu 02/01 10:20 AM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants California State License Board Swift, City of San Bernardino, Does, Employment Development Department, Teresa Garcia(in official capacity as Associate Tax Auditor and public employee), Teresa Garcia(as an individual), Sandra Mendez(as an individual), Sandra Mendez(in her official capacity as a public employee) Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.(Filing fee $405 FEE PAID), filed by Plaintiff Richard P. Avila. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet