Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00071
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Sep 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 6:43 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
LOWES COMPANIES, INC
Represented By
Kenneth Thomas Emanuelson, II
The Emanuelson Firm
contact info
Counter Defendant
WFR IP, LLC
Represented By
William P Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Defendant
LOWES COMPANIES, INC
327 Hillsborough Street
Raleigh, NC 27603
Represented By
Kenneth Thomas Emanuelson, II
The Emanuelson Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
WFR IP, LLC
Represented By
William P Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Sunday, September 08, 2024
19 19 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 09/09 9:44 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (CH)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Mon 09/09 9:42 AM
ORDER granting17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that all claims and causes of action asserted between Plaintiff and Defendant in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/8/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/04 7:33 PM
JOINT NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WFR IP, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 23, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 08/23 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Case Management Conference RESET for 9/5/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/21 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Bruce Henry on behalf of WFR IP, LLC (Henry, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 08/07 7:30 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 08/06 4:55 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by WFR IP, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Fri 07/26 11:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/26/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/22 1:30 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint LOWES COMPANIES, INC answer due 7/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/22/24. (CH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 07/18 4:35 PM
Defendant Lowe's Companies, Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint of WFR IP, LLC, Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity against WFR IP, LLC by LOWES COMPANIES, INC.(Emanuelson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 07/18 4:38 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/03 5:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by LOWES COMPANIES, INC.(Emanuelson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time
Thursday, June 20, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/20 12:09 PM
ORDER granting8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint LOWES COMPANIES, INC answer due 7/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/18 10:37 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by LOWES COMPANIES, INC.(Emanuelson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 03, 2024
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 06/03 9:00 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LOWES COMPANIES, INC to 6/18/2024. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(NKL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2024
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Sun 06/02 4:38 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LOWES COMPANIES, INC.(Emanuelson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 05/03 7:43 AM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LOWES COMPANIES, INC to 6/3/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(CH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 05/02 3:39 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LOWES COMPANIES, INC.(Emanuelson, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 02/02 11:23 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to LOWES COMPANIES, INC. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/02 11:20 AM
NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by WFR IP, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 02/02 11:19 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by WFR IP, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 02/02 11:16 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/02 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against LOWES COMPANIES, INC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-9955985.), filed by WFR IP, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/02 11:19 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Fri 02/02 11:22 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]