Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:24-cv-00340
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 6:23-cv-01073
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 7:41 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Barton Malow Company
Counter Claimant
CM Glazing LLC
Counter Defendant
Barton Malow Company
Counter Defendant
Rosemont Hotels, Inc.
a Florida corporation 3001 Sherberth Road
Kissimmee, FL 34747
Defendant
Goudreau Plastering
3601 Saxon Blvd.
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
Defendant
Barton Malow Company
Mediator
Bruce Norris
Plaintiff
Rosemont Hotels, Inc.
a Florida corporation 3001 Sherberth Road
Kissimmee, FL 34747
ThirdParty Defendant
Spectra Holdings, Inc.
865 W Irving Park RD
Itasca, IL 60143
ThirdParty Defendant
Lotspeich Contracting, Inc.
16101 NW 54th Ave.
Miami, FL 33014
ThirdParty Defendant
Hartford South, LLC
7326 South orange Ave
Orlando, FL 32809
ThirdParty Defendant
Heichel Plumbing, Inc.
1260 Marshall Farms Road
Ocoee, FL 34761
ThirdParty Defendant
Habitech Systems, Inc.
880 Airport RD Unit 110
Ormond Beach, FL 32174
ThirdParty Defendant
Goudreau Plastering
3601 Saxon Blvd.
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
ThirdParty Defendant
Glass Block Warehouse, L.C.
4425 SW Port Way
Palm City, FL 34990
ThirdParty Defendant
Del Air Heating
ThirdParty Defendant
CM Glazing LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
Air Conditioning & Refrigeration, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Lotspeich Contracting, Inc.
16101 NW 54th Ave.
Miami, FL 33014
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Barton Malow Company
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
Jonathan Nehmer + Associates, Inc.
Terminated: 01/30/2024
Counter Claimant
RTM Engineering Consultants, LLC
Terminated: 01/30/2024
a foreign corporation 7901 4th Street North Suite 300
St. Petersburg, FL 33702
Defendant
Jonathan Nehmer + Associates, Inc.
Terminated: 01/30/2024
Represented By
Annica Mae Mattus
Lee/shoemaker PLLC
contact info
Joseph Scott Shannon
Lee/shoemaker, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
RTM Engineering Consultants, LLC
Terminated: 01/30/2024
7901 4th Street North Suite 300
St. Petersburg, FL 33702
Represented By
Thomas Kincaid McCraw, Jr
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
127 127 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/26 11:07 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/24/2024. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 8:24-cv-00120-LKG. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Member Case Fri 04/26 11:42 AM
THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (24-120). (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]