Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Debra M Brown
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 3:24-cv-00029
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 6:58 AM CDT
Defendant
RSC Insurance Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew David Miller
Copeland, Cook, Taylor & Bush, P.A.
contact info
Nicholas K. Thompson
Copeland Cook Taylor & Bush P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Daniel James Hammett
Wells Marble & Hurst, PLLC
contact info
Clifford K. Bailey, III
Wells, Marble & Hurst, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By
Clifford K. Bailey, III
Wells, Marble & Hurst, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard S. Kumpf
Represented By
Jason Daniel Tullos
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
John Alexander Purvis
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp - Jackson
contact info
Slates C. Veazey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
268 268 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Strike Mon 05/19 1:46 PM
ORDER terminating161 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot205 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/19/2025. (lld)
Related: [-]
267 267 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Withdraw Mon 05/19 1:39 PM
ORDER terminating159 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting262 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/19/2025. (lld)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
266 266 17 pgs misc Memorandum in Support Fri 05/16 5:12 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re265 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Economy Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Bailey, Clifford)
Related: [-]
265 265 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/16 5:11 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Economy Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Bailey, Clifford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - American Economy Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Depo of Richard Kumpf,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Transcript of recorded interview of Kumpf,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Gas bill for Dec. 2022,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Emails between Kumpf and McCormick,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - January 23, 2023, letter to Kumpf,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - April 4, 2023, letter to Kumpf,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Depo of Keatris Austin,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Report of Luke Griffin,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Expert Report of David Hartman,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Expert Report of Scott Woods,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Expert Report of Jack Williams
264 264 27 pgs misc Memorandum in Support Fri 05/16 4:38 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re263 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Richard S. Kumpf. (Tullos, Jason)
Related: [-]
263 263 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 05/16 4:33 PM
Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Richard S. Kumpf. (Tullos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Rick Kumpf,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Transcript of recorded interview of Rick Kumpf,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Teresa Larrazabal,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Text Message between Winnifred Kumpf and Teresa Larrazabal,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Kumpf's 2022-2023 Utility Bills,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Oxford Property Contents List,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Deposition of William Evans,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Deposition of Stacy Humes,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Oct 27-Nov 1, 2022 Email Chain between Rick Kumpf and Stacy Humes,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Deposition of Paula Fulcher,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Deposition of Jobie Ziegler,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Dec 28-29, 2022 Email between Rick Kumpf and Stacy Humes,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Deposition of Amy Williams,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - Safeco Claims Notes,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - Deposition of Tracy Ainsworth,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - 2022 Mississippi Home and Earthquake Eligibility Guidelines,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - 2024 Mississippi Home and Earthquake Eligibility Guidelines,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - Safeco Residency Training Presentation,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - Deposition of Carol Wiek,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - Deposition of Jack Williams,
Att: 21 Exhibit U - Occupancy Interpretations Chart,
Att: 22 Exhibit V - Feb 6, 2023 Email between Rick Kumpf and Stacy Humes
262 262 motion Withdraw Fri 05/16 4:05 PM
MOTION to Withdraw160 Memorandum in Support,159 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Court's February 21 Order by Richard S. Kumpf. (Tullos, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
261 261 notice Notice of Conference Thu 05/15 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 5/21/2025 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
260 260 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 05/14 9:29 AM
ORDER granting215 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting245 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/14/25. (bnd)
Related: [-]