Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:24-cv-00329
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:0009 Motion to confirm arbitration award
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 7:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Morgan McIntyre Martin
Represented By
Stephanie Generotti
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa
contact info
Caren Skversky Marlowe
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa
contact info
Plaintiff
It Works Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey B. Fabian
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Ernest Joseph Marquart
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/16 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Judgment Wed 10/16 2:21 PM
JUDGMENT entered for Plaintiff in the amount of $1,036,131.39 for which sum let execution issue. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/16/2024. (JDR)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 9:42 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Final Judgment, (Dkt. 1), is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment for Plaintiff in the amount of $1,036,131.39 and CLOSE THIS CASE. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/16/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 2 pgs misc Supplement Wed 03/06 12:26 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint - Plaintiff It Works Marketing, Inc.'s Supplement to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Final Judgment, Amending L.R. 3.01(g) Certification to State that Motion is Unopposed by It Works Marketing, Inc.. (Marquart, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
10 10 2 pgs notice Notice of appearance Fri 02/16 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Generotti on behalf of Morgan McIntyre Martin (Generotti, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice of appearance Fri 02/16 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caren Skversky Marlowe on behalf of Morgan McIntyre Martin (Marlowe, Caren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
8 8 service Proof of service Thu 02/15 4:50 PM
PROOF of service by It Works Marketing, Inc. (Marquart, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
7 7 3 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/07 11:04 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by It Works Marketing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent It Works! Global, Inc. for It Works Marketing, Inc... (Marquart, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/06 2:25 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 02/05 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ernest Joseph Marquart on behalf of It Works Marketing, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Ernest J. Marquart. (Marquart, Ernest)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Standing Order Mon 02/05 3:35 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/5/2024. (KMN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 02/05 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/05 9:52 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-329-MSS-TGW. (AA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/02 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT - It Works Marketing, Inc.'s Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Final Judgment against Morgan McIntyre Martin (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21729888) filed by It Works Marketing, Inc..(Marquart, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Exhibit 1 - January 3, 2024 Final Award,
Att: 2 30 pgs Exhibit 2 - Distributor Agreement,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit 3 - June 20, 2022 Injunction Order,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 4 - March 7, 2023 Martin Deposition Excerpt,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - It Works Marketing, Inc. Annual Report 2023,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit 6 - Melaleuca, Inc. Annual Report 2023,
Att: 7 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet