New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:24-cv-00799
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 7:44 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Don Green Electric LLC
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Emerald Law, PLLC
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Emerald Management Group LLC
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Kiel Joseph Green
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Rome-Aire Services, Inc
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Global Merchant Cash Inc.
Represented By
Yeshaya Gorkin
Ainsworth Gorkin PLLC
contact info
Brian Philip Lanciault
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Don Green Electric LLC
1701 COSTA DEL SOL
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Emerald Law, PLLC
1701 COSTA DEL SOL
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Emerald Management Group LLC
1701 COSTA DEL SOL
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kiel Joseph Green
1701 COSTA DEL SOL
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Rome-Aire Services, Inc
1701 COSTA DEL SOL
BOCA RATON, FL 33432
Represented By
Robert C. Barchiesi, II
Barchiesi Law PLLC
contact info
Kiel Green
Emerald Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Global Merchant Cash Inc.
64 Beaver Street
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Yeshaya Gorkin
Ainsworth Gorkin PLLC
contact info
Brian Philip Lanciault
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 17 2024
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, I GRANT plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaims. Defendants are granted leave to amend, with any amended pleading to be filed within thirty (30) calendar days of the entry of this order. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/17/2024. (HTK)

Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
42 42 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/08 11:50 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Pursuant to Defendant Kiel Joseph's Green confirmed Chapter 11 plan (the "Plan") in In re Kiel JosephGreen, Case No. 24-21260 in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Florida, Plaintiff expressly reserves all its rights, claims, and remedies should Mr. Green fail to comply with the terms of the Plan. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/8/2025 ) (RG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/07 5:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
order Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 05/02 10:34 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff indicates in the40 status report that "Global Merchant's pursuit of claims against defendant Green is complete, unless he breaches the provisions of his confirmed plan". Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by May 7, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/2/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
40 40 3 pgs misc Status Report Thu 05/01 9:37 PM
STATUS REPORT by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
order Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 04/29 4:18 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a further status report by May 1, 2025 indicating how they intend to proceed against defendant Kiel Green. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/29/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 5:29 PM
STATUS REPORT by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
38 38 misc Status Report Tue 04/01 10:17 AM
STATUS REPORT by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 04/01 12:23 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a further joint status report within five (5) days of the conclusion of defendant Kiel Green's bankruptcy proceeding or by August 1, 2025 , whichever is sooner. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/1/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
order ~Util - Case Stayed Fri 03/21 12:26 PM
Case stayed for Bankruptcy or Appeal Proceeding. (RG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
order Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/04 1:31 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report within five (5) days of the conclusion of defendant Kiel Green's bankruptcy proceeding or by April 1, 2025 , whichever is sooner. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/4/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
37 37 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 12/03 4:17 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered against Non-Debtor Defendants in favor of Global Merchant, as to all claims against Non-Debtor Defendants, in the above-captioned case, in the total sum of $325,000.00. Signed by Deputy Clerk, Jalitza Poveda, on behalf of Clerk of Court, Brenna B. Mahoney on 12/3/2024. (see attached judgment for details). (JP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Tue 11/26 9:06 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants Offer of Judgement,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Entering Judgment
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 11/13 8:53 AM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report certifying the close of all discovery and indicating whether a dispositive motion is anticipated is extended to November 26, 2024. No further extensions will be granted unless good cause is shown. The parties are admonished to comply with Judge Kuo's Individual Practice Rule IV.D. that "Absent an emergency, requests must be made at least two (2) business days prior to the deadline for which an extension is sought." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/13/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
35 35 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/12 6:49 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Wed 10/30 12:59 PM
Notice of Filing Bankruptcy by Kiel Joseph Green. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
33 33 22 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/17 12:46 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, I GRANT plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaims. Defendants are granted leave to amend, with any amended pleading to be filed within thirty (30) calendar days of the entry of this order. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 10/17/2024. (HTK)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/04 3:33 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The proposed discovery plan filed at [31-1] is so-ordered with revisions. The deadline for the parties to file a joint status report certifying the close of all discovery and indicating whether a dispositive motion is anticipated is extended to November 12, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/4/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/04 3:11 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Revised Case Management Plan
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Tue 08/27 2:15 PM
Letter Defendants' letter correcting previous error in their opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss and clarifying intended references. by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
29 29 respoth Reply in Support Tue 08/20 3:33 PM
REPLY in Support re26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
28 28 20 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 08/20 3:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 08/20 3:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Merchant Agreement dated September 13, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Merchant Agreement Transaction History Statement dated September 12, 2023,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Amended Answer with Counterclaims,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support
26 26 motion Dismiss Tue 08/20 3:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Mon 07/22 5:59 PM
Letter regarding service of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/03 2:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte adjourns the settlement conference previously scheduled for July 8, 2024 sine die. The parties are reminded to continue with discovery as set forth in the18 discovery plan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/3/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 07/01 1:54 PM
The court has reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters concerning plaintiff's anticipated motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaims and determined that a pre-motion conference is not necessary. The court therefore grants plaintiff permission to bring the motion. The court directs that plaintiff's motion shall be briefed as follows: plaintiff's motion and supporting papers shall be served no later than July 22, 2024; defendants' opposition papers shall be served no later than August 9, 2024; plaintiff's reply papers, if any, shall be served no later than August 20, 2024. The fully briefed motion shall be filed in accordance with chambers' rules, including courtesy copies for chambers, no later than August 20, 2024. This schedule may be altered only with the permission of the court. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/1/2024. (GJ)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 07/01 3:37 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the discovery plan entered at18 , the parties were directed to submit confidential ex parte settlement statements via email to Chambers by June 28, 2024. Defendants have failed to comply with this Court order and are directed to submit the outstanding statements immediately. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/1/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/28 10:18 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re23 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
notice Notice(Other) Thu 06/20 11:07 AM
NOTICE. Plaintiff has submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference on an anticipated motion to dismiss defendants' counterclaims. Defendants' counsel is reminded that, under Judge Ross's Individual Motion Practices, defendants are required to file a responsive letter addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motion within seven business days from service of plaintiff's letter, on or before June 28, 2024. (GJ) Modified on 6/20/2024 (RG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
23 23 motion Pre Motion Conference Tue 06/18 6:15 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
22 22 cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Fri 06/14 12:46 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint with , COUNTERCLAIM against Global Merchant Cash Inc. by Kiel Joseph Green, Emerald Management Group LLC, Don Green Electric LLC, Rome-Aire Services, Inc, Emerald Law, PLLC. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order to Answer Fri 06/14 9:51 AM
ORDER TO ANSWER: Defendants are directed to file their Amended Answer by June 17, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/14/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 06/11 11:07 AM
ORDER: Defendants'21 Motion for Leave to File an amended answer, which includes counterclaims, is granted. Any request for a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's intended motion to dismiss the counterclaims must filed in compliance with District Judge Ross's individual practice rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/11/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Mon 06/10 8:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Defendant's Amended Answer with Counterclaims by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC, Kiel Joseph Green, Rome-Aire Services, Inc. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer with Counterclaims
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Thu 06/06 11:53 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The deadline for Defendants to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the proposed amended answer and file a motion to amend is extended to June 10, 2024 . The motion must also inform the Court whether Plaintiff opposes the motion. If Plaintiff opposes the motion, the deadline to file its opposition is extended to June 24, 2024. The deadline for the parties to exchange documents requests and interrogatories is extended to June 11, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/6/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 06/06 11:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Answer by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC, Kiel Joseph Green, Rome-Aire Services, Inc. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Revised Case Management Plan
Thursday, May 23, 2024
18 18 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/23 12:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on May 23, 2024. Brian Laniault, Esq. appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Robert Barchiesi, II, Esq. appeared on behalf of defendants. Defendants stated their intention to amend their answer. Defendants are directed to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the proposed amended answer and file a motion to amend by June 6, 2024 informing the Court whether Plaintiff opposes the motion. If Plaintiff opposes the motion, its opposition must be filed by June 20, 2024. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. A settlement conference will be held on July 8, 2024 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 11C South, before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Individual defendant must be present. A representative of plaintiff and the corporate defendants with complete settlement authority (other than counsel) must be present, unless leave is granted to participate by phone. The parties are directed to submit confidential ex parte settlement statements to Kuo_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov by June 28, 2024. The statements must include the last offer and demand, and a frank assessment of the strengths and weaknesses of each party's case. For guidance on the requirements for the statements, the parties should consult Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo's Individual Practice Rules. The Court will schedule ex parte telephone calls with counsel after review of the statements. If the parties wish to consent to Magistrate Judge Kuos jurisdiction for a dispositive motion, they must file the required consent form. A PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-dispositive-motion-magistrate-judge] The parties may withhold their consent without any adverse substantive consequences. (FTR Log: 10:02 - 10:20) (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 05/17 4:17 PM
STIPULATION re16 Proposed Scheduling Order regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 05/17 3:56 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 03/29 4:54 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/29 5:31 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference is adjourned to May 23, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. By May 17, 2024 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf] . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/29/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/26 9:53 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert C. Barchiesi, II is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/26/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/23 4:31 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert C. Barchiesi, II, Esq. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-17600921 by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC, Kiel Joseph Green, Rome-Aire Services, Inc. (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support by Robert C. Barchiesi, II, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Robert C. Barchiesi, II, Esq.,
Att: 3 Proposed Order on Motion Pro Hac Vice
Thursday, February 15, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/15 1:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on April 16, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By April 11, 2024 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: [LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf] Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defendants' counsel is directed to ensure that Plaintiff is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/15/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Tue 02/13 11:35 PM
Letter pursuant to Order by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC, Kiel Joseph Green, Rome-Aire Services, Inc (Green, Kiel)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/13 11:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kiel Green on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Green, Kiel)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/13 2:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Merchant Cash Inc. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/13 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Philip Lanciault on behalf of Global Merchant Cash Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 02/13 1:43 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Global Merchant Cash Inc.. (Lanciault, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/13 12:15 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kiel Green is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notifications of activity in this case are received. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/13/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 02/13 3:31 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brian Lanciault, Jr. is hereby substituted as attorney of record for Plaintiff in place of Attorney Yeshaya Gorkin. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/13/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/12 10:26 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-17563251 by Don Green Electric LLC, Emerald Law, PLLC, Emerald Management Group LLC, Kiel Joseph Green, Rome-Aire Services, Inc. (Green, Kiel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
order Status Report Order Wed 02/07 6:09 PM
ORDER: By February 14, 2024 , the parties are directed to file a letter identifying all members of the LLC entities and the citizenship of each member, so that the Court can determine whether there is complete diversity of citizenship and it has federal jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/7/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 02/05 12:53 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (AF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 02/05 12:46 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (AF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/05 12:44 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AF)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Mon 02/05 12:54 PM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (AF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/02 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DON GREEN ELECTRIC LLC, EMERALD LAW, PLLC, EMERALD MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC, KIEL JOSEPH GREEN, ROME-AIRE SERVICES, INC D/B/A ROME-AIRE SERVICES from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Kings, case number 537155/2023. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-17531865) (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Initial Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice to State Supreme Court - Kings County
1 1 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/02 4:19 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by DON GREEN ELECTRIC LLC, EMERALD LAW, PLLC, EMERALD MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC, KIEL JOSEPH GREEN, ROME-AIRE SERVICES, INC D/B/A ROME-AIRE SERVICES (Barchiesi, Robert)
Related: [-]