New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:24-cv-00795
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
3206 Realty LLC
Defendant
Broadway Barbers LIC INC.
Plaintiff
Lesaldo Shalto
Represented By
Bradly G. Marks
The Marks Law Firm, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 25, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Mon 03/25 4:24 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-01962, filed on 3/25/2024. (rju)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/15 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Broadway Barbers LIC INC. served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/15 2:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 3206 Realty LLC served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, legal clerk. Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
11 11 order Transfer Order E.D.N.Y. (Complaint) (case opening only) Wed 02/28 12:56 PM
ORDER: Because this action was improperly filed in the Southern District of New York, this Court must either dismiss it or transfer it to the Eastern District of New York. In order to promote the "expeditious and orderly adjudication" of this case on the merits, Rolle, 2004 WL 287678, at *3, I have determined to transfer the case. Consequently, it is hereby ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). Since defendants have not yet appeared, it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order upon defendants and, upon the docketing of this action in the Eastern District of New York, shall file proof of such service on the docket there. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/28/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Wed 03/06 8:47 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Mon 02/26 5:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Bradly G. Marks dated February 26, 2024 re: Letter Response in accordance with Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses's February 23, 2024 Order to Show Cause[Dkt. 9]. Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/23 6:31 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: No later than March 8, 2024, plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, why this action should not be transferred there. and as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/23/2024) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 02/22 11:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 3206 Realty LLC served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 02/21 2:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Broadway Barbers LIC INC. served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, LEGAL CLERK. Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/12 4:29 PM
ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery (but excluding motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, for injunctive relief, for summary judgment, or for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23) must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-barbara-moses. Parties and counsel are cautioned: As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 2/12/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/05 6:25 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/05/2024) (ama)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/05 11:56 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3206 Realty LLC, Broadway Barbers LIC INC...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 02/05 11:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bradly G. Marks. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 443 (Civil Rights: Accomodations); Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 446 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other); the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 02/05 11:53 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 02/05 11:55 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 02/05 11:55 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/02 4:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BROADWAY BARBERS LIC INC. AND 3206 REALTY LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/02 4:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/02 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against 3206 Realty LLC, Broadway Barbers LIC INC.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28899059)Document filed by Lesaldo Shalto..(Marks, Bradly)
Related: [-]