North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:24-cv-00087
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 8:02 AM EDT
Defendant
EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Represented By
CLINTON SHEPARD MORSE
Brooks Pierce Mclendon Humphrey & Leonard
contact info
ADAM T SCHRAMEK
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KUKA [HK] TRADE CO. LIMITED
Represented By
PATRICK G. SPAUGH
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
RONALD R. DAVIS
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - case Tue 03/19 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff KUKA [HK] TRADE CO. LIMITED (SPAUGH, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
15 15 17 pgs misc Memorandum Mon 03/04 12:13 PM
MEMORANDUM re14 MOTION to Transfer Case N.D. Ohio by Defendant EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION.(SCHRAMEK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Lance Hutt
Friday, March 01, 2024
14 14 motion Transfer Case Fri 03/01 10:09 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case N.D. Ohio by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2024(SCHRAMEK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Ex. A to Brief in Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/01 10:02 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brief by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2024(SCHRAMEK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of MTD
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/01 9:37 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2024 (SCHRAMEK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Special Appearance Fri 03/01 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney ADAM T SCHRAMEK on behalf of Defendant EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3775665.) (SCHRAMEK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/22 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney RONALD R. DAVIS on behalf of Plaintiff KUKA [HK] TRADE CO. LIMITED (DAVIS, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/16 11:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Jason Furniture Hangzhou Co. Ltd for KUKA [HK] TRADE CO. LIMITED.. (SPAUGH, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/16 9:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Epicor Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Epicor, Inc. for EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION.. (MORSE, CLINTON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/08 9:17 AM
STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES.(rw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal Wed 02/07 4:14 PM
NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendant EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION (MORSE, CLINTON)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Wed 02/07 4:16 PM
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (al)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Right to Consent Tue 02/06 10:51 AM
Notice of Right to Consent.(al)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to jurisdiction
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/06 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (State court document originally filed in Guilford county superior court, case number 24CVS2035, issued on 1/03/2024, listed as Exhibit 1 to the1 petition for removal) (al)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 02/06 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kuka [HK] Trade Co. Limited. (State court document originally filed in Guilford County superior court, case number 24CVS2035, listed as Exhibit 1 to the1 petition for removal). (al) (al)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/6/2024) exhibit 1
utility Case Referred to Mediation Tue 02/06 10:53 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (al)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/06 10:58 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EPICOR SOFTWARE CORPORATION. Answer due by 3/1/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/6/2024. (jsb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
2 2 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/05 1:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition for Removal by Epicor Software Corporation.(MORSE, CLINTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Extend
Friday, February 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Removal Fri 02/02 4:46 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Kuka [HK] Trade Co. Limited ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3755757.), filed by Epicor Software Corporation.(MORSE, CLINTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (State Court)