California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 5:24-cv-00234
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2024
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 2:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Burea of Engraving and Printing
Plaintiff
Devin Wade
6657 Canterbury Drive, Unit 202
Chino Hills, CA 91709


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Sat 02/10 8:15 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Request is DENIED. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Fri 02/02 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
3 3 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 02/02 12:30 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - Related [+]1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 7.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
Related: [-] ferred
Sunday, January 28, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 02/02 12:28 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Devin Wade. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Fri 02/02 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS filed against Defendant Burea of Engraving and Printing. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth., filed by Plaintiff Devin Wade. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons