California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-05754
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 1:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Remet Alcohols, Inc.
Represented By
Zoe Juliana Sussman
Akerman LLP
contact info
Ofelia Mishell Parreno-Taylor
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Remet Corporation
Represented By
Zoe Juliana Sussman
Akerman LLP
contact info
Ofelia Mishell Parreno-Taylor
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SpecOil LLC
Represented By
Jamie L. Dupree
Futterman Dupree Dodd Croley Maier LLP
contact info
James W. Christian
Christian Levine Law Group, LLC
contact info
Casidy Rae Newcomer
Christian Attar
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: ECF 1. SpecOil must show cause in writing by 11/22/2023, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/8/2023. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/13 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SpecOil LLC (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/22 2:51 PM
NOTICE by Remet Alcohols, Inc., Remet Corporation of Settlement (Sussman, Zoe)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/06 6:41 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, James Wes Christian. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/06 6:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Casidy Rae Newcomer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/05 11:45 AM
Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice James W. Christian (Amended Application) ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number 09151G.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/5/2024 filed by SpecOil LLC.(Christian, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/05 11:14 AM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice James W. Christian ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19093049.) filed by SpecOil LLC. (Christian, James)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/05 10:59 AM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Casidy R. Newcomer ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19092916.) filed by SpecOil LLC. (Newcomer, Casidy)
Related: [-]
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 02/05 9:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
19 19 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/02 9:37 AM
Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings.. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/2/2024 (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Fri 02/02 9:29 AM
This case will be randomly /reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
17 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Remet Alcohols, Inc., Remet Corporation.. (Parreno-Taylor, Ofelia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
15 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation Extending Defendants' Answer Deadline and for Continuance of Case Management Deadlines. Remet defendants to file answer by 2/28/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2024, is continued to 4/3/2024, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2024. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by Remet Alcohols, Inc., Remet Corporation. (Parreno-Taylor, Ofelia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpecOil LLC re6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines of Initiating Documents on Remet Alcohols, Inc. (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
11 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SpecOil LLC re6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines of Initiating Documents on Remet Corporation (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
10 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SpecOil LLC.. (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE:7 . The OSC at Dkt.7 , is resolved by the response, Dkt.8 . OSC is terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SpecOil LLC . (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
7 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: ECF 1 . SpecOil must show cause in writing by 11/22/2023, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/8/2023. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Summons Issued as to Remet Alcohols, Inc., Remet Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Proposed Summons. (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by SpecOil LLC (Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/22/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18819854.). Filed by SpecOil LLC.(Dupree, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet