New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-mj-00504
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 2:18 AM EST
Defendant
Victor Hester (1)
Represented By
Wedade Wendy Abdallah
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew Thomas McGrath
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Rochester
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/04/2024 3:02 AM EST
Thursday, February 01, 2024
Arrest of Victor Hester (JB)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Victor Hester. Attorney Wedade Wendy Abdallah for Victor Hester added., Set/Reset Hearings as to Victor Hester:( Initial Appearance set for 2/1/2024 12:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) (JB)
Related: [-]
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Victor Hester for 2/1/2024 (JB)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victor Hester (1). (JB)
Related: [-]
2 2 Petition and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/1/2024.(JB)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Initial Appearance as to Victor Hester held on 2/1/2024. Appearances: Wedade Wendy Abdallah, AFPD; Matthew Thomas McGrath, AUSA; Kristen Nenni, USPO. Deft advised of charges and rights. Deft indicates his intention to retain counsel, consents to provisional representation by the Federal Public Defender for purposes of the Initial Appearance proceedings. Govt moves for detention based on risk of flight and danger to the community. Deft reserves his rights to both a Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing at this time. Order regarding continuing Brady obligation read into the record and acknowledged by the Govt, written order to follow. The Court will adjourn the matter until next week to allow Deft time to make a decision about his representation and further about how he wishes to proceed regarding his right to a Detention Hearing. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 2/6/2024 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED UNDER 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(1)(D) FOR A PENDING DETENTION MOTION. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB)
Related: [-]