Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James S Gwin
Case #: 1:24-cv-00211
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Case in other court:Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, CV-23-990654
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Board of Education of the Euclid City School District
Represented By
Sara Ravas Cooper
Weston Hurd - Cleveland
contact info
James M. McWeeney, II
Weston Hurd
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney Seman
Represented By
Dennis L. Pergram
Manos, Martin & Pergram
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Ohio
Represented By
Dennis L. Pergram
Manos, Martin & Pergram
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2024
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/26/24. Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be remanded to state court as untimely removed. In its response, Defendant should address (1) whether the service date falls on the mailing date or the receipt date, and (2) whether Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(d) extends the period for removal. Defendant's response is due within 14 days of this Order and may not exceed 10 pages. If Plaintiff wishes to file a response, she must also do so within 14 days of this Order, and her response may not exceed 10 pages. (T,A)
GPO Apr 02 2024
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/2/24. The above-captioned case has been settled between the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the docket be marked, "settled and dismissed with prejudice." Parties are to file any subsequent order setting forth different terms and conditions relative to the settlement and dismissal of the within action as directed. Any such order shall supersede this order. FURTHER, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction to resolve disputes concerning the memorialization of this settlement agreement. (T,A)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/02 11:47 AM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/2/24. The above-captioned case has been settled between the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the docket be marked, "settled and dismissed with prejudice." Parties are to file any subsequent order setting forth different terms and conditions relative to the settlement and dismissal of the within action as directed. Any such order shall supersede this order. FURTHER, the Court retains continuing jurisdiction to resolve disputes concerning the memorialization of this settlement agreement. (T,A)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Tue 04/02 11:34 AM
Minutes of Case Management Conference [non-document] before Judge James S. Gwin on 4/2/24. All parties were present and consented to the use of video conferencing. Parties were able to reach an agreement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: S. Nageotte;Time: 1 hour 45 minutes) (T,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 03/28 8:57 AM
Attorney's Fees Itemization of Plaintiff-Relator filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pergram, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
order Order on Motion to excuse appearance Wed 03/27 10:58 AM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/27/24 granting defendant's7 Motion to excuse appearance. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
8 8 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 03/06 3:19 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Board of Education of the Euclid City School District.(Cooper, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A to Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
7 7 motion Excuse Appearance Wed 03/06 3:06 PM
Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance of the BOE at the April 2, 2024 CMC filed by Defendant Board of Education of the Euclid City School District.(Cooper, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 oth_ans Response/Reply/Sur-Reply Wed 03/06 3:00 PM
Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Board of Education of the Euclid City School District. Related document(s)5 . (Cooper, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Stephen A. Vasek, Treasurer of the Euclid City School District Board of Education,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certified copy of the Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas docket
Monday, February 26, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/26 10:28 AM
Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/26/24. Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be remanded to state court as untimely removed. In its response, Defendant should address (1) whether the service date falls on the mailing date or the receipt date, and (2) whether Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(d) extends the period for removal. Defendant's response is due within 14 days of this Order and may not exceed 10 pages. If Plaintiff wishes to file a response, she must also do so within 14 days of this Order, and her response may not exceed 10 pages. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
4 4 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 02/06 9:36 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/6/24 setting a case management conference on 4/2/2024 at 09:30 AM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. This Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel, and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Local Rule 30.1
Monday, February 05, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/05 11:31 AM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Board of Education of the Euclid City School District. (Cooper, Sara)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 02/05 11:31 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 02/05 10:47 AM
Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-23-990654 Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number AOHNDC-12390672. Filed by Board of Education of the Euclid City School District. (Cooper, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court case documents,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 02/05 11:29 AM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 02/05 11:29 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]