Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 4:24-cv-04028
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 6:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Kathaleen Lanahan
Defendant
Nader Zughayer
Defendant
Rimmele Vincenzo
Defendant
Village of Oak Lawn
Defendant
Unidentified Sheriffs Deputies
Defendant
Unidentified Cook County Prosecutors
Defendant
Thomas Stopka
Defendant
Toni Preckwinkle
Defendant
Tom Phelan
Defendant
Oak Lawn Police Department
Defendant
Jeremy L Moneyhun
Defendant
Thomas McMahon
Defendant
Mathew S Markos
Defendant
John J Mahoney
Defendant
Kerry M Kennedy
Defendant
Linzey D Jones
Defendant
Hickory Hills Police Department
Defendant
Mathew Harland
Defendant
Mohammed M Ghouse
Defendant
. Gallagher
Defendant
Kathleen Marie Burke
Defendant
. Black
Defendant
. Bedolla
Defendant
Carmen Kathleen Aguilar
Defendant
Cook County
Plaintiff
Kevin Keeler
7735 S. Oconto Ave Unit 1E
Bridgeview, IL 60455


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
27 27 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 11:01 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re 6/4/24 Filing Fee Receipt sent to Kevin Keeler (DW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
misc Remark Wed 07/03 4:30 PM
Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF NextGen 1.7.1.1 as case 1:24-cv-05605, filed 07/03/2024. (TK)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
order Order Mon 07/01 12:56 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on July 1, 2024. The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause as to why this action should not either be dismissed for improper venue or transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, as the conduct described in Plaintiff's complaint occurred in Cook County. See June 11, 2024 Text Order. In his response, Plaintiff states that he "consents to transfer to the Northern District of Illinois."26 Resp. Order Show Cause para. 25. Plaintiff contends that venue is appropriate in the Central District of Illinois but also consents to transfer to the Northern District of Illinois.26 Resp. Order Show Cause paras. 2225. The Court need not resolve whether venue is proper in the Central District, as transfer would be appropriate under either 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) or § 1406(a). See Moore v. Magiera Diesel Injection Servs., Inc., No. 18 C 3762, 2019 WL 2502029, at *6 (N.D. Ill. June 17, 2019). The interests of justice favor a transfer because the Northern District of Illinois has a stronger relationship to this controversy, and it would be more desirable for that court to resolve this dispute given its geographic proximity to the relevant actors and evidence. See Rsch. Automation, Inc. v. Schrader-Bridgeport Int'l, Inc., 626 F.3d 973, 978 (7th Cir. 2010); SMP Logic Sys., LLC v. Jerome Stevens Pharms., Inc., No. 11 C 5075, 2012 WL 245129, at *3 (N.D. Ill. Jan. 26, 2012). The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
26 26 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 06/26 8:17 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kevin Keeler. (JJK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/11 9:54 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on June 11, 2024. In light of Plaintiff's payment of the filing fee, the Court addresses the many motions Plaintiff has filed since the Court denied Plaintiff's5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See generally7 Feb. 27, 2024 Order. First, he has filed multiple motions requesting that the Court make certain corrections to his filings, see9 ;11 ;20 , followed by separate filings making those corrections himself, see, e.g.,13 ;23 . Therefore, Plaintiff's9 Request for Correction of Error in Civil Rights Complaint,11 Request for Leave for Correction of Errors in Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and20 Request to Correct Form of Pleading are MOOT. Going forward, should Plaintiff file future motions seeking leave to amend filings, Plaintiff must attach a complete, proposed amended filing that, if granted leave to file, will completely replace the original filing and stand on its own without reference to or reliance upon the original filing. Requests for leave to amend which fail to include the amended filing as an attachment will be denied, and amended filings which are filed directly onto the docket will be stricken. Second, Plaintiff has filed a12 Motion to Reconsider Request for Preliminary Injunction, asserting that he filed new affidavits addressing "more current events."12 Mot. Reconsider Prelim. Inj. para. 2. This motion is devoid of legal argument and fails to persuade the Court that it made a material error of law or fact and is therefore DENIED. Third, Plaintiff has filed multiple motions which are either single spaced or exceed the fifteen-page limit imposed by Local Civil Rule 7.1(B)(4). See10 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction (9 single-spaced pages);13 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction (44 pages);18 Memorandum of Law on the Constitutionality of Illinois Code of Criminal Procedure Article 104. Fitness for Trial, to Plead, or to be Sentenced (55 pages);19 Second Memorandum of Law on the Constitutionality of Illinois Code of Criminal Procedure Article 104. Fitness for Trial, to Plead, or to be Sentenced (5 pages, which the Court construes as part of the 55 pages of18 ). These10 13 18 19 filings are STRICKEN for non-compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.1(B)(4). Plaintiff is given leave to file a version of his requested relief which complies with the Court's Local Civil Rules by July 11, 2024. Fourth, Plaintiff's21 Request for Correction and to Issue and Serve Summons and22 Request for Status of Summons are MOOT due to Plaintiff's payment of the filing fee and the issuance of summonses for Cook County. See24 June 10, 2024 Not. Plaintiff has until September 9, 2024 to effectuate service upon Defendants. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Plaintiff is reminded that, as a party, he may not personally serve the summons and complaint. See id. 4(c)(2). Finally, Plaintiff has made inconsistent statements with respect to venue. In his first1 Civil Rights Complaint, he stated that he was a resident of Cook County, Illinois.1 Civil Rights Compl. 2. In his23 Amended Complaint, he states that venue here is proper because he was a resident of the Central District of Illinois "when the original complaint for this case was filed," but does not state what his former address was nor acknowledge the contrary statement of residency in his first complaint.23 Am. Civil Rights Compl. 3 (citing 28 U.S.C. § 1391). He states that "a substantial amount of the conduct complained of occurred when I was a resident in this District," id. at 34, but his allegations largely relate to conduct which occurred in Cook County, and venue is generally based upon the defendants' residency or where events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred, not where the plaintiff resides. See 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b). Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by June 25, 2024 as to why this action should not be either transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois or be dismissed. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 06/10 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Keeler. (DW)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Issued Mon 06/10 2:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Cook County. Summons returned to Plaintiff to effectuate service. (DW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/04 3:03 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ROC400000779 (ANW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Wed 05/08 12:06 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Kevin Keeler Requesting Status of Summons. (DW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/08 12:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Keeler.(DW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit AA,
Att: 2 Exhibit Z,
Att: 3 Affidavit in Support of Amended Complaint
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/24 9:55 PM
MOTION for Correction and to Issue and Serve Summons by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 5/8/2024.(TC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Monday, April 22, 2024
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/22 10:23 AM
MOTION to Correct Form of Pleadings by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 5/6/2024. (TC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
19 19 motion Expedite Thu 04/11 9:15 AM
MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed as "SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE CONSTITUTIONALITY OF ILLINOIS CODE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE ARTICLE 104. FITNESS FOR TRIAL, TO PLEAD OR TO BE SENTENCED" by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 4/25/2024 (DW)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 06, 2024
18 18 motion Expedite Mon 04/08 8:30 AM
MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed as "MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON THE CONSTITUTIONALITY OF ILLINOIS CODE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE ARTICLE 104. FITNESS FOR TRIAL, TO PLEAD OR TO BE SENTENCED" by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 4/22/2024 (JJK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
17 17 misc Affidavit Thu 04/04 5:27 PM
FOURTH AFFIDAVIT OF KEVIN KEELER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kevin Keeler. (TC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/01 10:35 AM
NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTIONS, AFFIDAVITS and EXHIBITS filed by Kevin Keeler. (TC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/28 2:17 PM
NOTICE: INDEX OF EXHIBITS FOR SECOND AFFIDAVIT in support of13 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin Keeler (JJK) Modified on 3/28/2024 to include filer (JJK)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/28 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Proposed Summons. (DW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/20 9:03 AM
Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 4/3/2024. (DW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
12 12 motion Reconsideration Thu 03/14 3:06 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re7 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 3/28/2024. (DW)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/14 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Correction of Errors In Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 3/28/2024. (DW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/13 9:33 AM
AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 3/26/2024(JJK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Saturday, March 09, 2024
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/11 11:26 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 3/25/2024 (JJK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 03/07 10:17 AM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot3 the Plaintiff's Request for Correction of Errors in Civil Rights Complaint in light of the Court denying his requested injunction. See 7 2/27/2024 Order. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/7/2024. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 03/06 9:54 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on March 6, 2024. Plaintiff has filed a8 Motion for Waiver of Surety Bond and to Issue Without Notice, requesting that the Court "dispense with the requirement for a bond in this case," and issue his requested injunction without further notice to Defendant.8 Mot. Waiver Bond Issue Without Notice paras. 2, 6. The Court has already denied Plaintiff's requested injunction. See7 Feb. 27, 2024 Order. Therefore, Plaintiff's8 Motion for Waiver of Surety Bond and to Issue Without Notice is MOOT. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 03/05 3:15 PM
MOTION for Waiver of Bond and to Issue Without Notice (Preliminary Injunction) by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 3/19/2024. (DW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit 1,
Att: 2 Affidavit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Q,
Att: 4 Exhibit R,
Att: 5 Exhibit S,
Att: 6 Exhibit T,
Att: 7 Exhibit U,
Att: 8 Exhibit V,
Att: 9 Exhibit W,
Att: 10 Exhibit X
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/27 10:21 AM
ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on February 27, 2024. Plaintiff Kevin J. Keeler's petition to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. 2, is GRANTED. His Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 5 is DENIED. The Court will conduct a merit review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) in a subsequent order. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/23 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Motion and Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction(ED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 notice of motion
Monday, February 19, 2024
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 02/20 9:53 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 3/4/2024(JJK) (JJK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 (2/20/2024) Exhibit K,
Att: 12 (2/20/2024) Index of Exhibits
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
4 4 service Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit Tue 02/06 10:51 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Karen A. Yarbrough, Cook County Clerk on 2/6/24 by Kevin Keeler. (TC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
3 3 motion Amend/Correct Mon 02/05 10:49 AM
Request for Correction of Errors in Civil Rights Complaint by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 2/20/2024. (ED)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/05 8:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin J Keeler. Responses due by 2/16/2024. (ED)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 8:49 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Kevin J Keeler.(ED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh 1,
Att: 2 Exh 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet