Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-21263

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jerrold N Poslusny Jr
Case #: 1:24-ap-01057
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
George Makropolos
Represented By
George Makropolos
contact info
Defendant
Demetrius Parrish, Jr.
Represented By
Demetrius Parrish, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
JL Management, LLC
Represented By
JL Management, LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Le
Represented By
John Le
contact info
Defendant
Euro Style Tile Installers LLC
Represented By
Euro Style Tile Installers LLC
contact info
Defendant
Andreas Toliopoulos
Represented By
Andreas Toliopoulos
contact info
Defendant
Amazing Flooring and Countertops, LLC
Represented By
Amazing Flooring and Countertops, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Thao Lee
Represented By
Thao Lee
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Charles
Represented By
Patrick Charles
contact info
Defendant
PC Enterprise, LLC
Represented By
PC Enterprise, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bim Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Bim Mortgage, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC
Represented By
Martha Baskett Chovanes
Fox Rothschild Llp.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
utility Close Adversary Case Tue 06/11 10:51 AM
Adversary Case (1:24-ap-1057) Closed. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case Sat 05/11 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 05/10 8:19 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Undeliverable Address: Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Esta Role type/cr id: pla Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: George Makropoulos Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: JL Management, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: John Le Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Euro Style Tile Installers LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Andreas Toliopoulos Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Amazing Flooring and Countertops, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Thao Lee Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Patrick Charles Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: PC Enterprise, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: BIM Mortgage, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 15 Order Dismissing Case
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 order Dismissing Case Wed 05/08 2:52 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+]. re: Lack Of Prosecution. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/8/2024. (kvr)
Related: [-] 11 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
court Hearing Held Wed 05/08 2:29 PM
Minute of 5/7/2024 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Dismissed for lack of prosecution Related [+] (cm)
Related: [-] 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/16/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/7/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.
court Hearing Held Wed 05/08 2:29 PM
Minute of 5/7/2024 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Moot, case dismissed Related [+] (cm)
Related: [-] 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR CORPORATE DEBTORS FAILURE TO OBTAIN COUNSEL. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/16/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/7/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.
Friday, April 19, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/20 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 04/23 11:36 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Undeliverable Address: Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Esta Role type/cr id: pla Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 11 Order to Show Cause (Upload),12 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 order Show Cause (Upload) Wed 04/17 2:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR CORPORATE DEBTORS FAILURE TO OBTAIN COUNSEL. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/16/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/7/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Show Cause (Upload) Wed 04/17 2:12 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/16/2024. Show Cause hearing to be held on 5/7/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Tue 04/16 3:34 PM
Minute of 4/16/2024 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: OSCs will be issued Related [+] (cm)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Hearing for: Status (related document:1 Notice of Removal by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney and Defendants. Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 04/12 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Tue 04/16 8:05 AM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Undeliverable Address: Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Esta Role type/cr id: pla Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: George Makropoulos Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: JL Management, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: John Le Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Euro Style Tile Installers LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Andreas Toliopoulos Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Amazing Flooring and Countertops, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Thao Lee Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: Patrick Charles Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: PC Enterprise, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS Undeliverable Address: BIM Mortgage, LLC Role type/cr id: dft Reason Undeliverable: INCOMPLETE ADDRESS , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 order Withdraw As Attorney Tue 04/09 3:39 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney. Martha Baskett Chovanes terminated as attorney. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/9/2024. (kvr)
Related: [-] 7
court Hearing Held Tue 04/09 2:32 PM
Minute of 4/9/2024 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted; Order will be signed Related [+] (cm)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP.Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: #1 Motion #2 Proposed Order) Modified on 3/18/2024 NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (McAuley, Catherine). Filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP
Monday, March 18, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/18 4:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Chovanes, Martha)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP.Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Motion # 2 Proposed Order) (Chovanes, Martha) Modified on 3/18/2024 NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP
7 7 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 03/18 12:30 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP.Hearing scheduled for 4/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Chovanes, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion
Att: 2 Proposed Order
court Clerk's Office Quality Control Message - Certification of Service Mon 03/18 3:21 PM
Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. Related [+]. (cm)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
court Hearing Held and Continued Tue 03/12 3:58 PM
Minute of 3/12/2024 Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Adjourned to 4/16/2024; Plaintiff's attorney is seeking to withdraw as counsel. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cm)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Hearing for: Status (related document:1 Notice of Removal by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney and Defendants. Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 misc Document Mon 03/11 4:14 PM
Document re: Status Report filed by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. (Chovanes, Martha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Thu 02/29 11:41 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Josh J.T. Byrne on behalf of Demetrius Parrish, Jr.. (Byrne, Josh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 08, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 02/09 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 02/07 12:20 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: All Defendants (INCOMPLETE ADDRESS) Related [+] (mrm)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Tue 02/06 3:54 PM
Notice of Hearing for: Status Related [+]. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney and Defendants. Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (eag)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC
2 2 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/06 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. (Chovanes, Martha)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC
court Hearing Scheduled (Document) Tue 02/06 3:27 PM
Status Hearing Scheduled Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (eag) Modified on 2/6/2024 TO REFLECT INCORRECT EVENT CODE - SEE #3 FOR CORRECTION (eag)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) filed by Plaintiff Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC
Monday, February 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 02/05 10:56 AM
Notice of Removal by Martha Baskett Chovanes on behalf of Whole Stones, LLC, Mehmet Kahyaoglu & 73 Real Estate LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Chovanes, Martha)
Related: [-]