Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-80637

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:24-ap-80008
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Minto Financial dba Minto Money
P.O. Box 58112
Minto, AK 99758
Represented By
Minto Financial dba Minto Money
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiara Jones
6251 Rime Village Dr. NW, Apt. 106
Huntsville, AL 35806
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/11 1:46 PM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-80008 Closed (dws)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 09, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 06/09 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 06/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones
Friday, June 07, 2024
22 22 court Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/11 1:41 PM
Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (dws)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Fri 06/07 4:00 PM
Final Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+], Approving Application For Compensation Signed on 6/7/2024. (mmb)
Related: [-] #16 #17
Sunday, May 19, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/19 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Tentative Ruling on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement and Application for Approval of Attorney's Fees
Friday, May 17, 2024
18 18 order Tentative Ruling on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement and for Approval of Atty Fees Fri 05/17 10:23 AM
Tentative Ruling on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement and Application for Approval of Attorney's Fees Signed on 5/17/2024 Related [+]. Objections due by 6/7/2024. (mmb)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones,17 Application for Compensation filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones
Thursday, May 16, 2024
17 17 motion Compensation Thu 05/16 3:59 PM
Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/11/2022 to 5/16/2024, Fee: $8,000.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Thu 05/16 3:57 PM
Joint Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation under Rule 9019 Filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 05/15 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Extend Time
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 05/15 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, May 13, 2024
13 13 order Extend Time Mon 05/13 3:32 PM
Amended Order Extending Time To File Settlement Documents Related [+] Signed on 5/13/2024. (tcw)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 order Extend Time Mon 05/13 3:03 PM
Order Extending Time To File Settlement Documents and Vacating Order To Show Cause Related [+] Signed on 5/13/2024. (tcw)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, May 11, 2024
11 11 motion Extend Time Sat 05/11 8:49 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Settlement Documents Filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
10 10 court Return Mail Tue 03/26 10:36 AM
Return Mail of Kiara Jones Related [+] (ksv)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Sunday, March 10, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Mon 03/11 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Friday, March 08, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Fri 03/08 8:46 AM
Order Vacating Deadlines Signed on 3/8/2024 Related [+]. (dwh)
Related: [-] 6 Report to Court filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 03/06 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion to Extend Time
6 6 misc Report to Court Wed 03/06 5:00 PM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Kiara Jones. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
5 5 order Extend Time Mon 03/04 9:36 AM
Order Approving Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Signed on 3/4/2024. (ksv)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, March 01, 2024
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 03/01 3:02 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Responsive Pleading to Complaint Filed by Defendant Minto Financial dba Minto Money (Watkins, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/06 2:13 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued Minto Financial dba Minto Money Date Issued 2/2/2024, Answer Due 3/4/2024 (ksv)
Friday, February 02, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Fri 02/02 2:58 PM
Summons Issued Minto Financial dba Minto Money Date Issued 2/2/2024, Answer Due 3/4/2024 (ksv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/02 1:27 PM
Adversary case 24-80008 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Kiara Jones against Minto Financial dba Minto Money. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificate of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Debtor's Bank Statement
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Minto Money Email 5-16-22