Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Myong J Joun
Case #: 1:24-cv-10296
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Retronix Semiconductor, LTD..
Plaintiff
GTC Gunes Sanayi Ye Ticaret A.S.
Represented By
Eric G. Penley
Advantage Trial Lawyers PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/02 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Penley, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/15 3:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Retronix Semiconductor, LTD... Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney) Entered in error (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/06 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 02/06 9:31 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Retronix Semiconductor, Ltd. Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10255407 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by GTC GNE SANAY ve TCARET A..(Penley, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form