Soto v. KCAP RE Fund III, LLC et al
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sheryl H Lipman |
Referred: | Charmiane G Claxton |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02079 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Capstone Real Estate Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KCAP Emerald Ridge, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KCAP RE Fund III, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KeyCity Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KeyCity Fund Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KeyCity Property Managment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KeyCity Staffing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramon Luis Soto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/12/2024. (shl) |
|
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Capstone Real Estate Services, Inc., KCAP Emerald Ridge, LLC, KCAP RE Fund III, LLC, KeyCity Capital, LLC, KeyCity Fund Management, LLC, KeyCity Property Managment, LLC, KeyCity Staffing, LLC. (O'Neal, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER TO FILE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OR RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/11/2024. (shl) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Courtesy Notice
Thu 06/06 7:37 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document11 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by KeyCity Capital, LLC, KCAP RE Fund III, LLC, Capstone Real Estate Services, Inc., KeyCity Property Managment, LLC, KeyCity Fund Management, LLC, KCAP Emerald Ridge, LLC, KeyCity Staffing, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note : Attorney failed to add himself as counsel for the defendants. Clerk's office has now added attorney. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Capstone Real Estate Services, Inc., KCAP Emerald Ridge, LLC, KCAP RE Fund III, LLC, KeyCity Capital, LLC, KeyCity Fund Management, LLC, KeyCity Property Managment, LLC, KeyCity Staffing, LLC. (O'Neal, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/14/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/31/2024. (shl) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ramon Luis Soto. All Defendants. (Patterson, Chris) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued as to Capstone Real Estate Services, Inc., KCAP Emerald Ridge, LLC, KCAP RE Fund III, LLC, KeyCity Capital, LLC, KeyCity Fund Management, LLC, KeyCity Property Managment, LLC, KeyCity Staffing, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Correction to1 Complaint, .(Patterson, Chris) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/05 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Mon 02/05 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) |
|
4 | 4
notice
ADR Compliance
Mon 02/05 3:37 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Deficiency Notice
Mon 02/05 3:36 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint, filed by Ramon Luis Soto has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleading has a hand written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4335972), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Patterson, Chris) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |