Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Paul C Huck
Case #: 1:24-cv-20463
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Financial Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By
Holly Mae Hamilton
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashanti Jackson
Represented By
Cortney Elizabeth Walters
The Law Office Of Cortney E Walters, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/03 3:06 PM
ORDER of Dismissal granting8 Motion to Dismiss1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Dismissing1 Complaint with prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
10 10 respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 04/12 12:48 PM
Defendant's REPLY to8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Holly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/05 12:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Ashanti Jackson. Replies due by 4/12/2024. (Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/25 6:49 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. Responses due by 4/8/2024.(Hamilton, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Defendant Financial Recovery Services, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant Financial Recovery Services, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant Financial Recovery Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 03/04 6:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Its Responsive Pleading [ECF No. 5]. Response/Answer to Complaint [ECF No. 1] due 3/25/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/4/2024. (chg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
6 6 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Fri 03/01 8:39 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint re1 Complaint. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/29 7:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint re1 Complaint by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/14/2024.(Hamilton, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/29 6:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Mae Hamilton on behalf of Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. Attorney Holly Mae Hamilton added to party Financial Recovery Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Hamilton, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/06 10:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Financial Recovery Services, Inc. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 02/06 9:53 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 8:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17269615, filed by Ashanti Jackson.(Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)