New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Case #: 1:24-cv-00877
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Director Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
David Allen Cooper
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
David Allen Cooper
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Director Michael Paul
Represented By
David Allen Cooper
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Attorney's Office
Represented By
David Allen Cooper
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
David Allen Cooper
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
S Lin
Represented By
Aleksander B Milch
The Kasen Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/20 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by S Lin without prejudice (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/20 12:19 PM
Civil Case Terminated. See 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. No judgment need be entered. (MLB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2024
12 12 notice Notice(Other) Sun 05/05 7:17 PM
NOTICE by S Lin re3 Notice of Related Case Notice of Termination of Related Case--Y Lin v. USCIS et al., 1:24-cv-00878-PKC (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/17 2:58 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Defendant's time to respond to the OTSC is extended to 6/14/2024. Plaintiff may reply, if any, by 7/15/2024. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/17/2024. (FG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/15 4:17 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 Order to Show Cause (Federal),, by Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael Paul, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (Cooper, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 10, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Sun 03/10 5:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by S Lin. Ur M. Jaddou served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; Michael Paul served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; U.S. Attorney's Office served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 2/26/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Immigration/Social Security Cases Wed 02/14 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Cooper on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Federal) Wed 02/14 6:13 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before 4/15/2024, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court. On or before 5/15/2024, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of Court. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/14/2024. Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office re1 Complaint, filed by S Lin. (FG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 02/12 12:24 PM
AMENED Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael Paul, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/08 10:12 AM
Proposed Summons. Re2 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, by S Lin (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 02/06 10:27 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/06 9:48 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re2 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, by S Lin (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Tue 02/06 9:35 AM
(Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/06 9:10 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael Paul, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), filed by S Lin. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A--USCIS Filing Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B--Demand Letter to USCIS
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 02/06 10:29 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Tue 02/06 10:39 AM
Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case 24-cv-878. (CV)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 9:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael Paul, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17538937 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by S Lin. (Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A--USCIS Filing Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B--Demand Letter to USCIS,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet