Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00018
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 4:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Hometown Plastics LLC
Defendant
Jo Rena Lehman
Defendant
Rick Dean Peridore, Jr.
Defendant
Sara Jo Peridore
Defendant
AC Bishop Sparks, Jr.
Defendant
Sherry L Sparks
Plaintiff
BMO Bank NA
Represented By
Grant E. Fortson
Lax, Vaughan, Fortson, Rowe & Threet P.A.
contact info

GPO Feb 03 2025
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A and against Defendants Hometown Plastics LLC, Sara Jo Peridore, Rick Dean Peridore, Jr., Jo Rena Lehman, Sherry L. Sparks and AC Bishop Sparks Jr.in the amount of $153,385.27, with costs and interest; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/3/2025. (jak)
GPO Feb 04 2025
AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of BMO Bank NA against Hometown Plastics LLC, AC Bishop Sparks, Jr, Sherry L Sparks in the amount of $153,385.27 with costs and interest. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/4/2025. (jak)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
16 16 order Judgment Tue 02/04 8:59 AM
AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of BMO Bank NA against Hometown Plastics LLC, AC Bishop Sparks, Jr, Sherry L Sparks in the amount of $153,385.27 with costs and interest. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/4/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 order Judgment - Default Mon 02/03 3:54 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff BMO Bank N.A and against Defendants Hometown Plastics LLC, Sara Jo Peridore, Rick Dean Peridore, Jr., Jo Rena Lehman, Sherry L. Sparks and AC Bishop Sparks Jr.in the amount of $153,385.27, with costs and interest; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/3/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 brief Brief in Support Thu 11/21 9:42 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re13 Motion for Default Judgment Brief In Support Of Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment filed by BMO Bank NA. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Default Judgment Thu 11/21 9:41 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Hometown Plastics LLC, AC Bishop Sparks, Jr, Sherry L Sparks Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by BMO Bank NA(Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
12 12 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 06/26 3:23 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hometown Plastics LLC, Jo Rena Lehman, Rick Dean Peridore, Jr, Sara Jo Peridore, AC Bishop Sparks, Jr, Sherry L Sparks. (jak)
Related: [-]
11 11 brief Brief in Support Wed 06/26 3:11 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re10 Motion for Entry of Default filed by BMO Bank NA. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 06/26 3:10 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default by BMO Bank NA (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/16 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, summons , filed by BMO Bank NA. Rick Dean Peridore, Jr served on 3/15/2024. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/16 3:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, summons , filed by BMO Bank NA. Sara Jo Peridore served on 3/15/2024. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/16 3:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, summons , filed by BMO Bank NA. Jo Rena Lehman served on 3/15/2024. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/02 10:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by BMO Bank NA. Sherry L Sparks served on 3/27/2024. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/08 3:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, summons , filed by BMO Bank NA. Hometown Plastics LLC served on 2/27/2024. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/08 3:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Summons , filed by BMO Bank NA. AC Bishop Sparks, Jr served on 2/27/2024. (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
service Summons Reissued Tue 02/13 1:46 PM
Summons Reissued as to Sara Jo Peridore, AC Bishop Sparks, Jr, Sherry L Sparks. Returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 02/12 10:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by BMO Bank NA (Fortson, Grant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
2 2 misc Deficiency Letter Tue 02/06 12:59 PM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re1 Complaint notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by BMO Bank N.A. Fee $405; Receipt No. JON239. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service.(wbb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet