California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Pslc Hhl
Case #: 5:24-cv-00660
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2024
Defendant
Angela Guardino
Defendant
Christopher Vu
Defendant
County of Santa Clara
Defendant
Daniel T. Nishigaya
Defendant
Elizabeth Peterson
Defendant
Graydon Carr
Defendant
Griffin Bonini
Defendant
James Gibbons-Shapiro
Defendant
Jasimin A. Long
Defendant
Jeffery Rosen
Defendant
Julie M. Hughes
Defendant
Karen Li
Defendant
Marina Mankaryous
Defendant
Monica Chavez
Defendant
Ruth Cote
Defendant
Sandra Parrentit
Defendant
Sean Ancelet
Defendant
Shella Deen
Plaintiff
Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix

GPO Apr 29 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OFCOUNSEL by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Oct 03 2024
ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/3/2024. Amended Complaint due by 10/31/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Nov 15 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Nov 15 2024
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Friday, November 15, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Fri 11/15 2:13 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
19 19 2 pgs order Order Fri 11/15 2:12 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Friday, October 04, 2024
utility Remark Fri 10/04 12:55 PM
copy of re18 order and two copies of the court's complaint form mailed to plaintiff. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
18 18 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines for Pro Se Prisoner Cases Thu 10/03 11:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/3/2024. Amended Complaint due by 10/31/2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/05 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/05 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/31 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, May 16, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/17 2:09 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against County of Santa Clara, Jeffery Rosen, Marina Mankaryous, Daniel T. Nishigaya, Shella Deen, Elizabeth Peterson, Griffin Bonini, Monica Chavez, Sean Ancelet, Sandra Parrentit, Graydon Carr, Jasimin A. Long, Angela Guardino, Christopher Vu, Karen Li, James Gibbons-Shapiro, Julie M. Hughes, Ruth Cote. Filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
utility Remark Tue 04/30 5:44 PM
copy of re13 order and two blank copies of prisoner's civil rights complaint mailed to plaintiff. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 04/29 2:36 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OFCOUNSEL by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/29 2:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; finding as moot 10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (tsh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Thu 03/14 10:14 PM
Letter dated 2/15/2024 from Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Thu 03/14 10:12 PM
APPLICATION AND DECLARATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appoint Counsel PSP Thu 03/14 10:10 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Wed 02/28 4:54 PM
Letter date 2/15/2024 from Daniel Feliz re Certificate of Funds. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appoint Counsel PSP Wed 02/28 4:52 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Wed 02/28 4:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix.(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, February 05, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Mon 02/05 7:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/14/2024. (tn, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served this notice along with the docket sheet by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/05 6:59 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP - CDCR Mon 02/05 6:58 PM
APPLICATION AND DECLARATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter Mon 02/05 6:56 PM
Letter dated 1/23/2024 from Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/05 6:55 PM
COMPLAINT BY A PRISONER UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, 42 u.s.c. § 1983 (no process) against County of Santa Clara, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered 2/5/2024). Filed by Daniel Joseph Fidel Felix. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]