Original Case: 4:23-cv-04372

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cr-20046
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2024
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 09, 2024 5:10 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Dow Chemical Company
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd, L.L.P.
contact info
Edward Joseph Bardelli
Warner Norcross & Judd, L.L.P.
contact info
Amanda May Fielder
Warner Norcross & Judd, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Cristy Bunker
Represented By
Alfonso Kennard Jr.
Kennard Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Christy Thomas Bunker
Represented By
Eddie Robert Hodges II
Kennard Law, P.C.
contact info
Alfonso Kennard Jr.
Kennard Law, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 07 2024
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [24-20046 Affirmed] Judge: EBC, Judge: JEG, Judge: ICR. Mandate issue date is 08/29/2024. [24-20046]

Docket last updated: 08/09/2024 5:10 AM CDT
Friday, February 02, 2024
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Cristy Bunker 24-20046 (RCB)
Related: [-]