Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 8:24-cv-00361
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Re-opened:Dec 30, 2024
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Dave Michalski
Represented By
Robert M Gittins
Eccleston & Wolf, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Subba Reddy
Defendant
Ciarra Roulhac
Represented By
Wendy L Shiff
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jeffrey Luoma
Maryland Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Chris Weir
Represented By
Erin Brady Purdy
contact info
DeNisha A Watson
Howard County Office Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Thaddeus Moore
10069 Guilford Rd
Jessup, MD 20794

GPO Aug 02 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/2/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Nov 14 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/14/2024. (c/m to P 11/14/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
GPO May 02 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/2/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
98 98 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Fri 05/02 10:56 AM
ORDER granting81 and87 Motions to Dismiss; granting89 Plaintiff Motion for Extension of Time; denying95 and96 Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/2/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
97 97 4 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 05/02 10:43 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/2/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]