Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Matthew W Brann
Case #: 4:24-cv-00215
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Case in other court:Clinton County Court of Common Pleas, 23-01302
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:39 AM EDT
Counterclaim Defendant
S.T.L. Resources, LLC
Represented By
Adam S. Ennis
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Counterclaim Plaintiff
Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Chester F. Darlington, Jr.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant
Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Chester F. Darlington, Jr.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
S.T.L. Resources, LLC
Represented By
Adam S. Ennis
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 04/24 3:29 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the14 Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED. This action shall be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Clinton County, Pennsylvania. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 4/24/2024. (ea)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Remand to State Court Wed 04/24 11:09 AM
Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by S.T.L. Resources, LLC.(Ennis, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 29, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Fri 03/29 9:04 AM
Letter from Adam S. Ennis, Esq. .(Ennis, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 03/13 4:12 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to7 Counterclaim by S.T.L. Resources, LLC.(Ennis, Adam) Modified on 3/13/2024 (jr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Friday, March 08, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/08 3:50 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's10 motion for extension of time is answer is GRANTED. Plaintiff will file an answer to Defendant's counterclaim on or before 3/13/2024. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/15/2024 is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled, if necessary after resolution of Plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand this action to State Court. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 3/8/2024. (ea)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/04 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference by S.T.L. Resources, LLC.(Ennis, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 29, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Thu 02/29 10:18 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Ennis is instructed to file a formal motion with a form order requesting the relief sought in the letter at DOC #9. (nr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Wed 02/28 1:27 PM
Letter from A. Ennis, Esq. to The Honorable Matthew W. Brann . (Ennis, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/21 3:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/15/2024 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 2/21/2024. (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 02/14 4:53 PM
Defendants ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc..(Darlington, Chester)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Wed 02/14 12:43 PM
Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 2/14/2024. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Fri 02/09 1:00 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by S.T.L. Resources, LLC. (Ennis, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate Wed 02/07 12:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of of Filing of the Notice of Removal with the State Court by Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,3 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations),2 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance . (Darlington, Chester)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Tue 02/06 3:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gulf Tank Holdings, Inc. for Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc.. (Darlington, Chester)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 02/06 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Ennis on behalf of S.T.L. Resources, LLC (Ennis, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice for Removal Tue 02/06 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc. from Clinton County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-1302. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 6537687), filed by Mobile Mini Tank and Pump Solutions, Inc..(nr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - County Complaint