South Carolina District Court
Judge:Jacquelyn D Austin
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 0:24-cv-00596
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc
Represented By
Chadwick S Devlin
Akerman Llp (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Alfred L. Twitty
315 East Dunlap Street
Lancaster, SC 29720


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 18, 2024
29 29 notice Notice Other Thu 04/18 12:13 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice (lbak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 15, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 04/15 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Alfred L. Twitty(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 03/27 9:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re:19 Order. by Chadwick S Devlin on behalf of Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc (Devlin, Chadwick)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Document Mailed Wed 03/27 8:52 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED19 Order,18 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Alfred L. Twitty 315 East Dunlap Street Lancaster, SC 29720. (apsn)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/27 8:51 AM
ORDER directing each legal representative entering an appearance in this matter on behalf of any defendant to complete a Defendant's Certification and file it with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party disagrees with the court's construction of the Plaintiff's claims, he or she may file an appropriate motion with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. (Defendant Certification due by 4/3/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 03/27/2024. (apsn)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/27 8:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/25/2024, Discovery due by 7/24/2024, Motions due by 8/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 03/27/2024. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
17 17 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/26 2:45 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.(Devlin, Chadwick)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/26 2:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.(Devlin, Chadwick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 03/06 12:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfred L. Twitty. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024.. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
14 14 misc Document Mailed Mon 03/04 1:28 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED1 Complaint,13 Summons Issued,12 Order Service placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Alfred L. Twitty 315 East Dunlap Street Lancaster, SC 29720. (apsn)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Mon 03/04 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. Service due by 6/3/2024. (apsn)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order - Service - Non-Inmate Mon 03/04 1:20 PM
ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 03/04/2024. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 02/20 2:12 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alfred L. Twitty.(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 misc Document Mailed Fri 02/16 11:37 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED7 Proper Form Order, 26.01 form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Alfred L. Twitty 315 East Dunlap Street Lancaster, SC 29720. (apsn)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Proper Form Order Fri 02/16 11:34 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 3/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 02/16/2024. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
5 5 misc Case Reassigned CV Tue 02/13 1:35 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Jacquelyn D Austin. Judge Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/06 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 300108849.), filed by Alfred L. Twitty.(apsn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope