Stewart v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00691 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Southern, 3:24-cv-00122 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Donna Stewart] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Donna Stewart] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Donna Stewart] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Donna Stewart. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Kassan, Randi) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00122. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 02/06 11:06 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Illinois (East St. Louis), 3:24-cv-00122-NJR, Stewart v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-691-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-439 cc: JPMDL (jml, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:24-CV-122-NJR. (clw) | |
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |