Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:24-cv-00029
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/19 11:40 AM
NOTICE by Lawrence Edward Madison re21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (SLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Filing Tue 05/06 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Filing: State Court Order, Order on Motion to Correct the Trial Transcript by Lawrence Edward Madison. (SLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
23 23 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Mon 05/05 2:31 PM
OBJECTION to21 Report and Recommendations by Lawrence Edward Madison. (pts)
Related: [-]
22 22 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Mon 05/05 10:46 AM
OBJECTION to21 Report and Recommendations by Lawrence Edward Madison. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 motion Report and Recommendations Order Mon 04/07 4:45 PM
ORDER, REPORT, AND RECOMMENDATION that Petitioner's1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and his request for evidentiary hearing be denied. Furthermore, Petitioner's17 and20 Notices, construed as Requests to Expand the Record, are denied. (Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2025.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/7/2025. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/18 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Filing: State Court Motion, "Motion to Correct the Trial Transcript; Request for Errata Sheet from Court Reporter," by Lawrence Edward Madison. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/11 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Shawn Gillis, Tyrone Oliver(Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Respondents Exhibit 2 a redacted copy of the trial courts order re-sentencing Petitioner on September 7, 2017.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Respondents Exhibit 6 a redacted copy of volume 1 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Respondents Exhibit 7 a redacted copy of volume 2 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Respondents Exhibit 8 (Part 1 of 2) a redacted copy of volume 3 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Respondents Exhibit 8 (Part 2 of 2) a redacted copy of volume 3 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.
18 18 respoth Response Fri 10/11 11:53 AM
RESPONSE to16 Order,, filed by Shawn Gillis, Tyrone Oliver. (Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Thu 10/10 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Lawrence Edward Madison (loh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
16 16 7 pgs order Order Thu 09/19 10:54 AM
ORDER directing Respondent to file redacted versions of any document, by October 11, 2024, within the state court record "volumes" or any other document containing the victim's personally identifying information regardless of whether it constitutes a judicial record, and to separately determine and inform the Court if the in camera documents do not constitute official state court records and therefore should be redacted in toto. The Clerk is directed to keep under seal documents [9-6]; [9-7]; [9-8]; [9-9]; [9-10]; [9-11]; and [9-12] re9 Notice of Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 09/19/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/19 10:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re redacted documents due by 10/11/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
15 15 respoth Response Wed 05/22 11:26 AM
RESPONSE as to8 Answer-RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lawrence Edward Madison. (loh)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/22 11:24 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION for Leave to File Discovery, filed by Lawrence Edward Madison. (loh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 05/07 9:38 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion for Leave to File; granting11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/7/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/01 12:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION for Leave to File Discovery And Request For Admissions filed by Shawn Gillis. (Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
11 11 motion Amend/Correct Thu 04/18 12:59 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Lawrence Edward Madison. Responses due by 5/2/2024. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/18 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Discovery by Lawrence Edward Madison. Responses due by 5/2/2024.REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb) (jrb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Admission of Facts
Att: 2 (4/18/2024) Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Tue 04/09 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Shawn Gillis(Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 a copy of the decision in Petitioners direct appeal, Madison v. State, 329 Ga. App. 856, 766 S.E.2d 206 (2014).,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 a copy of the trial courts order re-sentencing Petitioner on September 7, 2017.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 a copy of Petitioners state petition for writ of habeas corpus petition filed June 30, 2017,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 a copy of Petitioners state application for writ of habeas corpus filed on July 10, 2017.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 a copy of Petitioners brief in support of his state habeas corpus petition.,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 a copy of volume 1 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 a copy of volume 2 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 a copy of volume 3 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 a copy of volume 4 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 a copy of volume 5 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 a copy of volume 6 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 a copy of volume 7 (of 7) of the transcript of the March 28, 2019 evidentiary hearing in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 a copy of the final order denying relief in Petitioners state habeas case.,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts August 21, 2023 order denying Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal.,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts September 3, 2023 remittitur following its CPC denial.
8 8 answer Response to Habeas Petition Tue 04/09 12:40 PM
Answer- RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shawn Gillis.(Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Briefs Brief In Support Of Answer-Response
Friday, March 22, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Fri 03/22 9:08 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the caption of this case to indicate that the Respondents are Shawn Gillis, Warden, and Tyrone Oliver, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Georgia Department of Corrections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/22/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan H. Hill on behalf of Shawn Gillis (Hill, Meghan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Intervene Wed 02/28 2:00 PM
MOTION to Intervene Motion of Corrections Commission Tyrone Oliver To Intervene as Party Respondent by Shawn Gillis. Responses due by 3/13/2024.(Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Briefs Brief in Support of Corrections Commissioner Tyrone Oliver's Motion To Intervene as Party Respondent
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Oldham on behalf of Shawn Gillis (Oldham, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 02/28 2:36 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:5 MOTION to Intervene Motion of Corrections Commission Tyrone Oliver To Intervene as Party Respondent. (csr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Mon 02/26 11:23 AM
Letter from Lawrence Edward Madison (pts)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
2 2 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/09 10:49 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the relief sought should not be granted. Madison is DIRECTED to file his reply to the Respondents answer or other pleading no later than 30 days from the date that answer or other pleading is served. Request of Court Appointed Counsel is denied. Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on February 9, 2024. (jrb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 02/06 4:35 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lawrence Edward Madison.(wwp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Part 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Part 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Part 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Part 8
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 02/06 4:36 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 400001296. (wwp)
Related: [-]