Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-00143
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 4:27 AM CDT
Defendant
State of Tennessee Department of Health, Tennessee Board of Nursing
Represented By
Rachel Greer Appelt
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Reed Neal Smith
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Sydney Puckett
Represented By
Garrett E. Asher
Surber, Asher, Surber & Moushon, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/20 2:23 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per14 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Judge Trauger's Chamber. No Order to enter.*** (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/16 3:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sydney Puckett. (Asher, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 02/15 9:46 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel Greer Appelt admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/14 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Greer Appelt on behalf of All Defendants (Appelt, Rachel)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 02/14 9:12 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Reed Neal Smith admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/13 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Reed Neal Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Reed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
11 11 order Temporary Restraining Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 02/08 12:29 PM
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Hearing is set for 2/21/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/8/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Thu 02/08 12:21 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Entry of a TRO. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/8/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice of Filing Tue 02/06 6:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Sydney Puckett re1 Complaint, Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Anna Herring, PA-C(Asher, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Affidavit of Anna Herring, PA-C
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/06 6:44 PM
NOTICE by Sydney Puckett re1 Complaint, Identifying Exhibits filed with Complaint (Asher, Garrett)
Related: [-]
7 7 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 02/06 6:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sydney Puckett . (Asher, Garrett)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs misc Proposed Pretrial Order Tue 02/06 6:23 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by Sydney Puckett. (Asher, Garrett)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 02/06 6:19 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sydney Puckett.(Asher, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Representation,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - E-mail from Counsel from Board,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Letter from Counsel for Board,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Consent Order,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Emily Glenn, NCC, LPC, CSAT,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Anna Herring, PA-C,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Findings of US Department of Justice
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 02/06 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 02/06 4:25 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 02/06 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/06 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against State of Tennessee Department of Health, Tennessee Board of Nursing (Filing fee $405, Receipt number BTNMDC-400676), filed by Sydney Puckett.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit 1 to Complaint,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 2 to Complaint,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 3 to Complaint,
Att: 5 11 pgs Exhibit 4 to Complaint,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit 5 to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Tue 02/06 4:36 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : Counsel failed to include the mandatory description of the attached exhibits. Counsel is directed to file a notice that lists each exhibit with a brief description. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 02/06 4:37 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Garrett E. Asher admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]