New Mexico District Court
Judge:Matthew L Garcia
Referred: Kirtan Khalsa
Case #: 1:24-cv-00118
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 3:26 AM MDT
Petitioner
Larry Marker
P.O. Box 3188
Roswell, NM 88202
Respondent
Martin Zamora
Respondent
New Mexico House of Representatives
Respondent
Tanya Mirabal Moya
Respondent
Rod Montoya
Respondent
Matthew McQueen
Respondent
Marian Matthews
Respondent
Jimmy Mason
Respondent
Javier Martinez
Respondent
Alan Martinez
Respondent
Kristina Ortez
Respondent
Willie Madrid
Respondent
Patricia Lundstrom
Respondent
Tara Lujan
Respondent
Stefani Lord
Respondent
Charlotte Little
Respondent
Derrick Lente
Respondent
T Ryan Lane
Respondent
Joseph Sanchez
Respondent
James Townsend
Respondent
Elizabeth Thomson
Respondent
Luis Terrazas
Respondent
Reena Szczepanski
Respondent
Nathan Small
Respondent
Linda Serrato
Respondent
Larry Scott
Respondent
Debra Sarinana
Respondent
Harlan Vincent
Respondent
Angelica Rubio
Respondent
G Andres Romero
Respondent
Andrea Romero
Respondent
William Rehm
Respondent
Andrea Reeb
Respondent
Randall Pettigrew
Respondent
Cristina Parajon
Respondent
Patricia Roybal Caballero
Respondent
Art De La Cruz
Respondent
Eleanor Chavez
Respondent
Jack Chatfiled
Respondent
Gail Chasey
Respondent
Christine Chandler
Respondent
Kathleen Cates
Respondent
Ambrose Castellano
Respondent
Micaela Cadena
Respondent
Meredith Dixon
Respondent
Cathrynn Brown
Respondent
Cynthia Borrego
Respondent
John Block
Respondent
Brian Baca
Respondent
Gail Armstrong
Respondent
Janelle Anyanonu
Respondent
Anthony Allison
Respondent
Eliseo Alcon
Respondent
Yanira Gurrola
Respondent
Jenifer Jones
Respondent
D Wonda Johnson
Respondent
Tara Jaramillo
Respondent
Dayan Hochman-Vigil
Respondent
Susan Herrera
Respondent
Pamelya Herndon
Respondent
Joshua Hernandez
Respondent
Jason Harper
Respondent
Raymundo Lara
Respondent
Joy Garratt
Respondent
Miguel Garcia
Respondent
Harry Garcia
Respondent
Doreen Gallegos
Respondent
Natalie Figueroa
Respondent
Joanne Ferrary
Respondent
Candy Ezzell
Respondent
Mark Duncan

GPO Feb 07 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
GPO Mar 21 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
GPO Jun 18 2024
THIRD ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
85 85 1 pgs JUDGMENT by District Judge Matthew L. Garcia. (arp)
Related: [-]
84 84 NOTICE MEMORIALIZING DISMISSAL by District Judge Matthew L. Garcia re83 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case. (arp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
83 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Larry Marker (arp)
Related: [-]