California Central District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00154
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2024 11:22 PM PST
Defendant
Jorge Armando Contreras (1)
Represented By
Ronald D. Hedding
Hedding Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Billy Joe McLain
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Brett A. Sagel
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
James Edmund Dochterman
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 9:11 PM PDT
Thursday, October 12, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras in violation of 18:666(a)(1)(A) Embezzlement concerning programs receiving federal funds. Approved by Magistrate Judge John D. Early as to Jorge Armando Contreras (1). (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras. (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting3 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to Jorge Armando Contreras (1) (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 REDACTED COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras in violation of 18:666(a)(1)(A) Embezzlement concerning programs receiving federal funds. Approved by Magistrate Judge John D. Early as to Jorge Armando Contreras1 (pj) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
5 5 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras; defendants Year of Birth: 1971; date of arrest: 10/19/2023 (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Contested detention hearing held, granting6 REQUEST for Detention as to Jorge Armando Contreras (1). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Ronald D. Hedding for Jorge Armando Contreras, Retained, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 11/27/2023 10:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Government moves to keep the complaint sealed. The Court grants the motion and orders the government to file a redacted version of the complaint. Court Smart: CS 10/19/23. (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; filed by Ronald D. Hedding appearing for Jorge Armando Contreras (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras, (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras directed to appear on 11/27/23 at 10:00 am before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras. (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras. (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
14 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras:Entry is missing image. Re: Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10) (mhe) [8:23-mj-00513-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
15 15 (ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed) filed as Seizure Warrant Executed on 10/19/2023. (McLain, Billy)[8:23-mj-00513-DUTY] Modified on 11/14/2023 (pj).
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
16 16 INDICTMENT Filed as to Jorge Armando Contreras (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in Orange. (mat)
Related: [-]
17 17 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Billy Joe McLain as to Defendant Jorge Armando Contreras; defendants Year of Birth: 1971 (mat)
Related: [-]