Brian Keith Robinson v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00094 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 06, 2024 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sulpizio, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 02/08 2:25 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 1/8/2024), Brian Keith Robinson v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00094-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Nevada (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cper, ) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11514433.), filed by Brian Keith Robinson. Service due by 4/8/2024(cper, ) |