Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-25147

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Anderson
Case #: 2:24-ap-02017
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Predictive Technology Group, Inc,, a Nevada corporation
Represented By
T. Edward Cundick
Workman Nydegger
contact info
Defendant
Tyumen Holdings, LLC, a Utah Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Austin C Nate
Ray Quinney & Nebeker P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Weston Shields
Ray Quinney & Nebeker P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Predictive Biotech, Inc., a Utah Corporation
Represented By
Predictive Biotech, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bestek Products, LLC, a Utah limited Liability Company
Represented By
Bestek Products, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
court Dispose Adversary Case Mon 01/06 7:56 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2017 Disposed. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
25 25 order Remand (order) Fri 05/31 1:42 PM
Order Granting Motion for Remand and/or Abstain Related [+] (am)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
24 24 misc Pending Order Wed 05/29 12:07 PM
Pending Order Re:11 Motion for Remand. (Billings, David)
Related: [-]
order Unsigned Order (order) Wed 05/29 10:00 AM
Unsigned Order Related [+]. Reason Order Was Unsigned: Please revise the caption of the case to conform to the listed defendants on the docket. (mkh)
Related: [-] 23 Pending Order filed by David P. Billings
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
23 23 misc Pending Order Wed 05/22 12:00 PM
Pending Order Re:11 Motion for Remand. (Billings, David)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Wed 05/22 1:57 PM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 23 Pending Order Re:11 Motion for Remand. (Billings, David) [Order# 450170]
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Wed 05/22 5:09 PM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Predictive Technology Group, Inc. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand and Joinder to Trustee's Initial Findings Filed by Bestek Products, LLC,23 Pending Order Re:11 Motion for Remand. (Billings, David) [Order# 450170]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
22 22 audio Digital Audio Recording Tue 05/21 3:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/21/2024 10:01:12 AM ]. File Size [ 11330 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:23:36 ]. (Motion to Remand). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Tue 05/21 10:59 AM
Minute Entry Re:11 Motion for Remand Filed by Bestek Products, LLC. Appearances: David P. Billings (Pla. Bestek Products, LLC); T. Edward Cundick (Def.); Jeffrey Weston Shields (Def. Tyumen Holdings, LLC). P. Matthew Muir (Def. Predictive Biotech, Inc.). Motion granted. Findings and conclusions made on the record. Pending Order Deadline due by 06/04/2024. OTF-Billings (jst)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
21 21 answer Reply Fri 05/17 3:42 PM
Reply to Related [+] in Support of Motion to Remand and Response to Tyumen's Motion to Strike Filed by Bestek Products, LLC. (Billings, David)
Related: [-] 8 Trustee's Response,11 Motion for Remand,17 Objection,18 Motion to Strike
Thursday, May 09, 2024
20 20 notice Notice Thu 05/09 11:49 PM
Notice Related [+] of Joinder Filed by Predictive Technology Group, Inc. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-] 17 Objection filed by Defendant Tyumen Holdings, LLC
19 19 misc Joinder Thu 05/09 4:17 PM
Joinder to Objection to Motion to Remand Filed by Predictive Biotech, Inc. (Muir, P.)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Strike (Motion) Thu 05/09 2:58 PM
Motion to Strik Related [+] Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 8 Trustee's Response
17 17 answer Objection Thu 05/09 2:38 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand
16 16 order File Overlength Memorandum (order) Thu 05/09 7:38 AM
Order Granting Tyumen's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum in Support of Objection to Motion to Remand Related [+] (am)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 misc Pending Order Wed 05/08 4:35 PM
Pending Order Re:14 Motion to File Overlength Memorandum. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion File Overlength Memorandum (Motion) Wed 05/08 4:34 PM
Ex Parte Motion to File Overlength Memorandum in Support of Objection to Motion to Remand Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Tyumen's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum in Support of Objection to Motion for Remand
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice Mon 04/22 5:03 PM
Notice Related [+] Errata to Docket #s 9 and 10 to Correct Error of Defendant Names in Caption - Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by Defendant Tyumen Holdings, LLC,10 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 notice *Notice of Hearing Tue 04/16 12:56 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by Bestek Products, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Deadline for filing objections: 5/3/2024. (Billings, David)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand
11 11 motion Remand (Motion) Tue 04/16 12:39 PM
Motion for Remand and Joinder to Trustee's Initial Findings Filed by Bestek Products, LLC. (Billings, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Tue 04/16 12:37 PM
Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 6/2/2025. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 6/17/2025 at 10:00AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. (am)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Parties' Planning Meeting Fri 04/12 6:08 PM
Notice of Parties' Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Discovery Plan Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
8 8 trustee Trustee's Response Fri 03/29 7:43 AM
Trustee's Response and Limited Appearance filed by Trustee Re: Related [+]. (Jones tr, Philip)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Friday, March 22, 2024
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 03/22 11:19 AM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Predictive Biotech, Inc. (Chandler, Deborah)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 03/22 11:56 AM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Predictive Biotech, Inc. (Muir, P.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 09, 2024
7 7 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sat 03/09 10:17 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference
Thursday, March 07, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 03/07 4:40 PM
Stipulation RE: Related [+] for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 5 Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference
5 5 order Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conf. (order) Thu 03/07 7:51 AM
Amended Order and Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252.Report of Parties Planning Meeting due by 4/12/2024. (jst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
4 4 notice Notice Tue 02/20 5:08 PM
Notice - Bankruptcy Rule 7001.1 Disclosure of Defendant Tyumen Holdings, LLC Filed by Tyumen Holdings, LLC. (Shields, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 10, 2024
3 3 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sat 02/10 10:16 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 02/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference
Thursday, February 08, 2024
2 2 order Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conf. (order) Thu 02/08 9:34 AM
Order and Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 10:00 AM at ZoomGov.com/join - KRA: Meeting ID: 160 3007 6397, Passcode: 6001201, Phone 1-669-254-5252. Report of Parties Planning Meeting due by 3/8/2024. (mfr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (FEE) Wed 02/07 12:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 24-02017 . Notice of Removal by Defendant Predictive Technology Group, Inc,, Tyumen Holdings, LLC, Predictive Biotech, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(s): [01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)]. (Nate, Austin)
Related: [-]