Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 2:24-cv-04021
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 3:39 AM CDT
Defendant
Russell Childers
Represented By
Joshua David Moore
Clement, Van Ronzelen & Schulte LLC
contact info
Defendant
Cody Davidson
Represented By
James C. Sanders, II
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
James M Brodzik
Hinshaw & Culbertson-Belleville
contact info
Defendant
Conda Davidson
Represented By
James C. Sanders, II
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
James M Brodzik
Hinshaw & Culbertson-Belleville
contact info
Defendant
Exp Realty, LLC
Represented By
James C. Sanders, II
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
James M Brodzik
Hinshaw & Culbertson-Belleville
contact info
Defendant
RAC-JAC, LLC
Represented By
Joshua David Moore
Clement, Van Ronzelen & Schulte LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Sutherland
55 Costa del Sol Drive
Lake Ozark, MO 65049
Represented By
Lisa Sutherland
Mo Protection And Advocacy Services
contact info
Defendant
World Wide Inspection Systems, LLC
Dorothy Neal 420 Overlook Road
Lake Ozark, MO 65049
Represented By
Lisa Sutherland
Mo Protection And Advocacy Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin Colquitt
Represented By
Michael L. Belancio
Watters Wolf Bub Hansmann
contact info
W. James Foland
Watters Wolf Bub Hansmann
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Breeana O'Sullivan
Third Party Defendant
Nicol O'Sullivan
Third Party Defendant
O'Sullivan Real Estate Group
Third Party Plaintiff
Bryan Sutherland
Represented By
Lisa Sutherland
Mo Protection And Advocacy Services
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
World Wide Inspection Systems, LLC
Represented By
Lisa Sutherland
Mo Protection And Advocacy Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
73 73 order Order Mon 09/09 9:53 AM
The Court hereby acknowledges receipt of Doc. no.72 , THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AGAINST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS. For good cause stated, the motion is granted. Signed on 9/9/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 08, 2024
72 72 motion Dismiss Case Sun 09/08 4:24 PM
MOTION to dismiss case filed by Lisa Sutherland on behalf of Bryan Sutherland. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sutherland, Lisa)
Related: [-]