New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00918
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Terminated:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Primal Nutrition, LLC
Plaintiff
Mykayla Fagnani
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 E. 18th Street
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/10 11:23 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Primal Nutrition, LLC. Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/29 12:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Primal Nutrition, LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/08 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Mykayla Fagnani..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/08 9:36 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Primal Nutrition, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/08 9:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 02/08 9:33 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/08 9:36 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/07 11:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/07 11:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Primal Nutrition, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/07 10:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Primal Nutrition, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28919477)Document filed by Mykayla Fagnani..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]