USA v. Cooper
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 6:23-cr-06207 |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2024 2:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Andrew Cooper (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/13/2024 4:03 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
Arrest of Andrew Cooper (CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Initial Appearance as to Andrew Cooper held on 1/10/2023. Defendant advised of rights. The government summarizes the charges. Defendant requests court-appointed counsel. Avik Ganguly is appointed. Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P 5(f), the Court ordered the government to produce all exculpatory evidence pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and advised that failure to do so could result in consequences, including sanctions and contempt proceedings. The government moves for detention on risk of flight and dangerousness. Detention Hearing/Set PH Date: 1/13/23 at 10:00 a.m.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with Avik Ganguly, Esq., Sarah Whitcomb, USPO(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 1/13/2023. Brian DeCarolis has been retained as counsel. Defendant does not wish to go forward with the detention hearing at this time. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 1/27/23 at 10:00 a.m. TIME FROM 1/13/23 THROUGH 1/27/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with Brian DeCarolis, Esq., Avik Ganguly, Esq., Jennifer Cannito, USPO(Digital Recording) (CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 1/27/2023.The parties make a joint request for an adjournment. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 2/13/23 at 9:30 a.m. TIME FROM 1/27/23 THROUGH 2/13/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with Brian DeCarolis, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
NOTICE as to Andrew Cooper. The time of the 2/13/23 status conference has been changed from 9:30 a.m. to 10:30 a.m. (CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | ||
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 2/13/2023. Defendant does not wish to schedule a detention hearing at this time. Defendant requests an adjournment to pursue a possible resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date: 3/13/23 at 12:15 p.m. TIME FROM 2/13/23 THROUGH 3/13/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with Brian DeCarolis, Esq.(Digital Recording) (CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 3/13/2023.James Nobles appears as retained counsel. Defendant does not wish to schedule a detention hearing at this time. The parties are pursuing a possible resolution. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 4/25/23 at 9:30 a.m. TIME FROM 3/13/23 THROUGH 4/25/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with James Nobles, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 4/25/2023. Defendant requests an adjournment to pursue a possible resolution. The defendant does not wish to schedule a detention hearing at this time. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 5/24/23 at 9:30 a.m. TIME FROM 4/25/23 THROUGH 5/24/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with James Nobles, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 5/24/2023. Defendant requests an adjournment to pursue a possible resolution. Defendant does not wish to schedule a detention hearing at this time. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 6/14/23 at 2:00 p.m. TIME FROM 5/24/23 THROUGH 6/14/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with James Nobles, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 6/14/2023. Defendant requests an adjournment to pursue a possible resolution. The government will prepare a revised plea agreement. Plea negotiation could be more favorable to the defendant if he remains in custody. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 7/20/23 at 11:00 a.m. TIME FROM 6/14/23 THROUGH 7/20/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with James Nobles, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 7/20/2023. Defendant requests an adjournment to pursue a resolution. Defendant does not wish to schedule a detention hearing at this time as negotiations could be more favorable to him if he does not go forward with the hearing. Status Conference/Set PH Date/Set Detention Hearing Date: 8/4/23 at 10:00 a.m. TIME FROM 7/20/23 THROUGH 8/4/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with James Nobles, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson:Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 8/14/2023. Defendant requests an adjournment to wait for final approval of the proposed plea agreement. The plea is conditioned on the defendant remaining in custody. Status Conference/Set PH Date: 9/14/23 at 10:00 a.m. TIME FROM 8/14/23 THROUGH 9/14/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE.Appearances: Charles Moynihan, AUSA, Defendant with James Nobles, Esq.(Digital Recording)(CAM) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
Attorney update in case as to Andrew Cooper. Attorney Yousef N. Taha for Andrew Cooper added. Attorney James L. Nobles terminated. (LMD) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | ||
17 | 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Appearances: Def. w/Yousef Taha, Esq.; Matthew McGrath, AUSA appearing for Charles Moynihan, AUSA. Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 9/14/2023. Yousef Taha substituted as retained counsel for defendant. James Nobles is relieved as counsel for defendant. Still working on a resolution. Status Conference set for 10/27/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Time Excluded as to Andrew Cooper from: 9/14/2023 TO 10/27/2023 IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE. Defendant remains detained. (FTR Recording.) (LMD) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
18 | 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 10/27/2023. Defendant advised that he has reviewed the discovery and has been in negotiations with the Government, and requested an adjournment until the first week of December to continue negotiations. Government had no objection. Court granted the request. Status Conference set for 12/5/23 @ 10:00 a.m. Defendant reserved his right to a detention hearing. TIME FROM 10/27/23 THROUGH 12/5/23 EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE. Appearances: Charles E. Moynihan, AUSA; Yousef N. Taha, Esq. with defendant. (Digital Recording) (KAH) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Sunday, December 03, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
22 | 22 TEXT ORDER as to Andrew Cooper. Plea Agreement Hearing set for 2/6/2024 03:00 PM before Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/6/23.(PR) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
23 | 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Appearances: Def. w/Yousef Taha, Esq.; Charles Moynihan, AUSA. Status Conference as to Andrew Cooper held on 1/10/2024. Disposition reached. Status Conference reset for 2/6/2024 04:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Marian W. Payson. EXCLUDABLE TIME: 1/10/2024 TO 2/6/2024. EXCLUDABLE TIME: 1/10/2024 TO 2/6/2024 IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Andrew Cooper. (FTR Recording.) (LMD) [6:23-mj-04012-MWP] | |
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
27 | 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.:Plea Hearing as to Andrew Cooper held on 2/6/2024, Plea entered by Andrew Cooper (1) Guilty Count 1. PROBATION NOTIFIED OF PLEA. Sentencing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM before Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Sentencing Statements/Motions due by 4/17/24; Responses/Objections due by 4/24/24; Character Letters/PSR to the Court by 5/1/24. Defendant is continued detained. Chuck Moynihan, AUSA; Yousef Taha, Esq. (Court Reporter Brandi Wilkins.)(PR) |