California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00017
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 11:38 PM PST
Defendant
Joel Dowen (1)
Represented By
Jai M. Gohel
Attorney At Law
contact info
Erick L. Guzman
Law Offices
contact info
John Paul Reichmuth
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Dan Karmel
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2024
ORDER as to Joel Dowen granting 7 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference and Exclude Time under the Speedy Trial Act until 1/29/2024: Status Re: Detention Hearing and Status re: Defendant retaining new Counsel continued to 1/29/2024 10:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/23/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2024) Modified on 1/23/2024 (ig, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 29 2024
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Joel Dowen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/29/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2024)
GPO Apr 03 2024
***ERRONEOUS ENTRY; PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 24*** Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Joel Dowen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/03/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2024) Modified on 4/3/2024 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 03 2024
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Joel Dowen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/03/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2024)
GPO Apr 04 2024
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Micah-Luc Almeida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/04/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2024)

Docket last updated: 02/08/2024 12:45 AM PST
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Joel Dowen (1), on Count(s): 1. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Joel Dowen. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros GRANTING 2 Motion to Seal as to Joel Dowen (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 01/09/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]