Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00001
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2024 2:30 AM EST
Defendant
Brenda Chunga (1)
Represented By
Jonathan Paul Van Hoven
Jonathan P. Van Hoven, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Spencer Todd
Doj-Usao
contact info
Aaron Simcha Jon Zelinsky
Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/08/2024 3:13 AM EST
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 SEALED INFORMATION as to Brenda Chunga (1) count(s) 1. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION and ORDER to Seal as to Brenda Chunga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Aslan on 1/9/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]