Maryland District Court
Judge:Brendan Abell Hurson
Case #: 1:24-cv-00387
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 03, 2024
Case in other court:Kari Lynn Wiechel v. Jessica Marie Lloyd, C-07-CV-24-000044
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Jessica Marie Lloyd
Represented By
Sean P Edwards
Law Offices Of Frank F. Daily, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kari Lynn Wiechel


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
7 7 order Settlement Order Wed 04/03 3:27 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 4/3/2024. (c/m 4/3/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Fri 02/09 5:05 PM
Removal Notification Letter to Plaintiff. (c/m to P on 2/9/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 corresp Miscellaneous Fri 02/09 5:01 PM
Correspondence from the Clerk to State Court Plaintiff's Counsel. (c/m on 2/9/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Fri 02/09 4:59 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (c/m to P on 2/9/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/09 4:58 PM
ANSWER to2 State Court Complaint by Jessica Marie Lloyd.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 02/09 4:57 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Jessica Marie Lloyd, filed by Kari Lynn Wiechel.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Fri 02/09 4:58 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CECIL COUNTY, MARYLAND. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/08 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11077363), filed by Jessica Marie Lloyd.(Edwards, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet