Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-11000

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:24-ap-01021
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Terminated:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Gembala
Represented By
David Gembala
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
for FarFromBoring Promotions.Com, LLC c/o Michael R. Bakst, Esq. 525 Okeechobee Blvd. #900
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Rilyn A Carnahan, Esq.
Greenspoon Marder, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
43 43 court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/17 4:27 PM
Adversary Case 9:24-ap-1021 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-]
42 42 ordertext Order Dismissing Adversary Case as Settled (TEXT ONLY) [CRD ONLY] Wed 07/17 4:25 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding as Settled **Per DE#158 in Main Case**. ***The parties in this adversary proceeding have reached a settlement. The settlement agreement was filed in the main bankruptcy case, and the Court has entered an order in the main case approving the settlement agreement. Therefore, this adversary proceeding is DISMISSED AS SETTLED. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement. This dismissal does not affect the validity or enforceability of any judgment entered before or after entry of this Order. Movant is directed to serve copies of this text-only order upon required parties and file a certificate of service with the court pursuant to Local Rule 2002-1(F). SO ORDERED by Judge Mindy A Mora . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
41 41 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Tue 06/25 3:06 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy Related [+]. (Carnahan, Rilyn)
Related: [-] 39 Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(24 Motion to Compel)] Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
40 40 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Tue 06/18 11:27 AM
Notice of Continued Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
Monday, June 17, 2024
39 39 motion Continue Hearing Mon 06/17 9:56 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(24 Motion to Compel)] Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy (Carnahan, Rilyn)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Filing Mon 06/17 2:02 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Approve Stipulation to Compromise Controversy Between Trustee and David Gembala, Filed in Main Case [ECF No. 156] , Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy. (Carnahan, Rilyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/23 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Agreed Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories ). Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Adam, Lorraine)
Monday, May 20, 2024
36 36 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 05/20 3:54 PM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories ). Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Continue Hearing Mon 05/20 2:30 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(24 Motion to Compel)] Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/17 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Agreed Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories ). Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/14 11:47 AM
Certificate of Service OF AGREED ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING TO 05/21/2024 AT 10:00AM Filed by Defendant David Gembala Related [+]. (Moore, Richard)
Related: [-] 32 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
32 32 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 05/14 8:41 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: ( 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories ). Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy). Pretrial Conference set for 09/11/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Adam, Lorraine)
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
30 30 5 pgs order Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Tue 05/07 4:49 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 09/11/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
29 29 motion Continue Hearing Tue 05/07 2:50 PM
Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(24 Motion to Compel,26 Notice of Hearing)] Filed by Defendant David Gembala (Moore, Richard) Title Modified on 5/8/2024 (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 04, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sun 05/05 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing (Re:24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy) Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference.
Friday, May 03, 2024
27 27 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 05/03 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Michael R. Bakst Esq. Related [+]. (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, May 02, 2024
26 26 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 05/02 11:42 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Filing Wed 05/01 4:28 PM
Notice of Filing Exhibits , Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy Related [+]. (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
24 24 motion Compel Wed 05/01 4:10 PM
Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery and/or Trustee's Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Wed 05/01 4:07 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy Related [+]. (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery, and/or Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
22 22 attyhrg Notice of Hearing by Filer Wed 05/01 2:18 PM
Notice of Hearing by Filer Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 10:00 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery, and/or Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)
21 21 motion Compel Wed 05/01 2:16 PM
Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with Discovery, and/or Motion for Court Order Increasing the Number of Allowed Interrogatories Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Thursday, April 18, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/19 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Agreed Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney for Defendant (Re: 16 ) (Adam, Lorraine)
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
19 19 order Withdraw As Attorney Order Tue 04/16 2:29 PM
Agreed Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney for Defendant Related [+] (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] # 16
Thursday, April 11, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/11 9:12 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant David Gembala Related [+]. (Grant, Joe)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Hearing
Monday, April 08, 2024
17 17 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 04/08 3:05 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Romaguera-Serfaty, Maria)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant David Gembala filed by Defendant David Gembala
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/03 9:59 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant David Gembala (Grant, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/30 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Second Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: 9 ) (Adam, Lorraine)
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 order Extend Time Order Wed 03/27 12:39 PM
Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Second Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+] (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] # 9
Monday, March 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Mon 03/25 10:04 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of the Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions; Interrogatories; and Requests for Production upon Defendant David Gembala , Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy. (Bakst, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/20 4:55 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Trustee's Complaint Filed by David Gembala. (Moore, Richard)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 03/20 4:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Richard Scott Moore Jr Filed by Defendant David Gembala. (Moore, Richard)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/18 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Re: 6 ) (Adam, Lorraine)
Friday, March 15, 2024
9 9 motion Extend Time Fri 03/15 11:28 AM
Second Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant David Gembala (Grant, Joe)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/15 9:19 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant David Gembala Related [+]. (Grant, Joe)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time
7 7 order Extend Time Order Fri 03/15 5:57 AM
Agreed Order Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] # 6
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 motion Extend Time Mon 03/11 4:04 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant David Gembala (Grant, Joe)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 03/11 3:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Joe M. Grant Esq. Filed by Defendant David Gembala. (Grant, Joe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/15 3:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on David Gembala 2/15/2024 Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy, Defendant David Gembala. (Carnahan, Rilyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 02/08 10:22 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/17/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Bakst, Trustee in Bankruptcy
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 02/08 10:21 AM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on David Gembala Answer Due 3/11/2024 (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/07 11:36 PM
Adversary case 24-01021 Complaint by Michael R. Bakst, Trustee against David Gembala. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property) (Carnahan, Rilyn) Nature of Suit Modified on 2/8/2024. (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 02/07/2024)
Related: [-]