Wassell v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00763 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:24-cv-00286 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Wassell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Jeffrey Wassell] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Jeffrey Wassell] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Jeffrey Wassell] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeffrey Wassell. Service waived by Monsanto Company waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Kassan, Randi) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00286. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 02/08 12:36 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED:, Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:24-cv-00286, Wassell v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-00763-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 440 cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |