California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:24-cv-00267
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02024-01371168
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 1:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Sunrise Senior Living LLC
Represented By
Jane J Kim
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Hazel U Poei
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Martin
Represented By
Edgar Manukyan
Manukyan Law Firm Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 28, 2024
10 10 misc Receipt Fri 03/29 2:39 PM
Receipt of remand letter (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
9 9 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 02/14 12:55 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court. (twdb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Remand Case to State Court Wed 02/14 12:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT SUA SPONTE by Judge David O. Carter: For the reasons set forth above, the Court hereby REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of Orange, California. Case number 30-2024 01371168-CU-WT-CJC. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 02/13 1:34 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Speath to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:24-cv-00267 DOC(JDEx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 02/12 9:51 AM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Sunrise Senior Living LLC. (Poei, Hazel)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 02/12 8:56 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Thursday, February 08, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/08 12:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Poei, Hazel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/08 12:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company, (Poei, Hazel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/08 12:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Poei, Hazel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/08 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Superior Court, case number 30-2024 01371168-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36881392 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Hazel U Poei added to party SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Poei, Hazel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Hazel U. Poei in Support of Defendant's Removal of Civil Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Civil Case Cover Sheet),
Att: 4 Exhibit C (Summons),
Att: 5 Exhibit D (Notice of CMC),
Att: 6 Exhibit E (POS Re S&C - Sunrise Senior Living, LLC),
Att: 7 Exhibit F (Answer to Martin's Complaint),
Att: 8 Declaration of Wendy Sekel in Support of Defendant's Removal of Civil Action
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 02/12 8:53 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Sunrise Senior Living LLC.Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Christina Martin.[FILED IN STATE COURT 1/02/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 02/12 8:55 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Sunrise Senior Living LLC.[FILED IN STATE COURT 2/1/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 7 EXHIBIT F TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]