Taylor et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marsha J Pechman |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00169 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 4:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Amazon.com Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Selway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/29 4:00 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Robert Selway, Jeffrey Taylor, to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Berman, Steve) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 12:22 PM
ORDER re18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John E Schmidtlein for DEFENDANT Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 1:39 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John E. Schmidtlein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8436964 (Goldmark, John) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 04/15 12:54 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/28/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/13/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/20/2024. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 3:01 PM
ORDER re12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin M Hodges for DEFENDANT Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 2:58 PM
ORDER re11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carl R Metz for DEFENDANT Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 2:55 PM
ORDER re10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jenny N Wheeler for DEFENDANT Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/10 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/3/2024, (Goldmark, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 10:34 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin M. Hodges FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8425073 (Goldmark, John) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 10:29 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carl R. Metz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8425058 (Goldmark, John) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 10:24 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jenny N. Wheeler FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8425024 (Goldmark, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion
Tue 02/27 8:53 AM
ORDER granting Parties'7 Stipulated MOTION Regarding Amazon.com, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint. The Court extends Amazon's deadline to respond to the Complaint to 4/10/2024. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/26 4:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Goldmark, John) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 02/23 1:43 PM
Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amazon.com, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint , filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 2/23/2024, (Goldmark, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/23 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Goldmark on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Goldmark, John) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Related Case
Fri 02/16 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:23-cv-01495-JHC, by Plaintiffs Robert Selway, Jeffrey Taylor. (Berman, Steve) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 02/14 10:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon.com, Inc. on 2/13/2024, filed by Plaintiffs Robert Selway, Jeffrey Taylor. (Berman, Steve) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/12 10:36 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc (CR) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 02/12 10:33 AM
Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CR) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Thu 02/08 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00996-JHC, by Plaintiffs Robert Selway, Jeffrey Taylor. (Berman, Steve) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/08 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Robert Selway(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Jeffrey Taylor(pty:pla) filed by Jeffrey Taylor, Robert Selway.(Berman, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for Amazon.com, Inc. |