Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00129
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
CNB Retailers, LLC
5534 Saint Joe Road
Fort Wayne, IN 46835
Defendant
Brett Hart
5534 Saint Joe Road
Fort Wayne, IN 46835
Defendant
Christina Miller
5534 Saint Joe Road
Fort Wayne, IN 46835
Plaintiff
Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.
946 Quality Drive
Lancaster, SC 29720
Represented By
Jason D Rosenberg PHV
Alston & Bird Llp - Atl/ga
contact info
Mark D Boveri
Krieg Devault Llp - Mis/in
contact info
Uly S Gunn PHV
Alston & Bird Llp - Atl/ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Nutramax Laboratories, Inc.
946 Quality Drive
Lancaster, SC 29720
Represented By
Jason D Rosenberg PHV
Alston & Bird Llp - Atl/ga
contact info
Mark D Boveri
Krieg Devault Llp - Mis/in
contact info
Uly S Gunn PHV
Alston & Bird Llp - Atl/ga
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
27 27 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/22 6:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. re26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief on Defendants CNB Retailers, LLC, Brett Hart, and Christina Miller (Gunn PHV, Uly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/21 2:34 PM
STIPULATED CONSENT INJUNCTION ORDER granting25 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Consent Injunction Order as outlined. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 10/16/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/17 3:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Consent Injunction Order by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc..(Gunn PHV, Uly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Consent Injunction Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 10:47 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 07/22 9:40 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the22 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal. Dismissal papers due by 10/10/2024. Text entry by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 7/22/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 07/18 2:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc.. (Gunn PHV, Uly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 06/18 10:11 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the20 CONSENTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal. Dismissal Papers due by 8/1/2024. Text entry by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 6/18/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 06/13 10:33 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Plaintiffs Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc.. (Gunn PHV, Uly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/17 9:42 AM
ORDER: The deadline to file dismissal papers is now SET for 6/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/16/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 05/09 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Tentative) by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. (Gunn PHV, Uly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/24 4:07 PM
ORDER granting16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason D Rosenberg PHV for Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. and Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/24/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
16 16 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 4:40 PM
Application for Attorney Jason Demian Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. and Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5553240(Rosenberg, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing
Monday, March 25, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/25 12:12 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gretchen S Lund for all further proceedings. Judge Damon R Leichty no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 3/25/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Order Striking Document ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/12 5:11 PM
ORDER: The Court has no choice but to STRIKE the answer filed on behalf of CNB on March 11, 202411 . The Court now AFFORDS Defendant CNB until 05/10/2024, to secure counsel for this matter. The Court also extends the deadline for all Defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint to this same date. Failure to secure counsel may result in the undersigned recommending that the presiding judge enter default judgement against CNB as a sanction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 03/12/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 1:13 PM
ORDER granting12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Uly S Gunn PHV for Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences and Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/5/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 10:45 AM
Application for Attorney Uly S. Gunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. and Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5508453(Gunn, Uly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia
Friday, March 01, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/04 4:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by CNB Retailers, LLC, Brett Hart, Christina Miller.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 16, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/16 1:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. Christina Miller served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/16 12:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. Brett Hart served on 2/12/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/16 12:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. CNB Retailers, LLC served on 2/13/2024, answer due 3/5/2024. (Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/09 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to CNB Retailers, LLC, Brett Hart, Christina Miller. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Report Fri 02/09 11:09 AM
REPORT by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark . (Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Fri 02/09 10:58 AM
Contacted attorney regarding need for AO 120 form to be submitted. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/09 10:49 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/08 2:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc.. (Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/08 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Boveri on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/08 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5486667.), filed by Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc..(Boveri, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons to CNB Retailers,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons to Brett Hart,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons to Christina Miller,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet