New Jersey District Court
Judge:Stanley R Chesler
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-00760
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 4:57 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
PARSHHUERAM MISIR
Forchelli, Curto, Deegan, Schwartz, Mineo & Terrana, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
NUCO PAINTING CORP.
Represented By
PARSHHUERAM MISIR
Forchelli, Curto, Deegan, Schwartz, Mineo & Terrana, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By
GREGORY B. PASQUALE
Jalloh & Jalloh, LLC
contact info
Defendant
LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
175 BERKLEY STREET
BOSTON, MA 02116
Represented By
PARSHHUERAM MISIR
Forchelli, Curto, Deegan, Schwartz, Mineo & Terrana, LLP
contact info
Defendant
NUCO PAINTING CORP.
Represented By
PARSHHUERAM MISIR
Forchelli, Curto, Deegan, Schwartz, Mineo & Terrana, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By
GREGORY B. PASQUALE
Jalloh & Jalloh, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 03/20 7:11 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/19/2025. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/20/2025. (tt, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 03/19 10:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Settlement Conference held on 3/18/2025. Case settled, order to be filed. (JB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/25 5:23 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated 02/15/25 requesting an adjournment of the 02/27/25 settlement conference due to a conflicting trial date. ECF No.26 . The request is GRANTED. The settlement conference is hereby rescheduled for March 18, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. IN PERSON at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 9, Newark, NJ 07102. Trial counsel and all parties must attend. If a corporate or government entity is a party, then a person with full settlement authority must attend. If an insurance carrier is involved, then an adjustor with full settlement authority must attend (in addition to the insured party). Each party shall submit, by email to SDA_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than ten double spaced pages no later than five business days before the conference. Voluminous exhibits to settlement letters (exceeding 20 pages) will not be reviewed by the Court unless submitted in hard copy that is received by Chambers no later than five (5) business days in advance of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/25/2025. (JB)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/25 3:32 PM
Letter from Unique Scaffolding. (PASQUALE, GREGORY) Modified on 2/25/2025 Motion to adjourn conference (JB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Wed 01/15 6:34 PM
Letter from Counsel for Defendants.(MISIR, PARSHHUERAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Performance and Payment Bond
24 24 misc Letter Wed 01/15 5:11 PM
Letter from Gregory B. Pasquale.(PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11/27 12:49 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery is extended to March 31, 2025. (Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Newark - PO Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.)Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 11/26/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 12/03 6:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Settlement Conference held on 11/26/2024. (smf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/10 2:47 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Newark - PO Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Discovery due by 11/20/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/6/2024. (and)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
minutes Status Conference Mon 09/09 11:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Status Conference held on 9/6/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Tue 09/03 4:57 PM
Letter from Gregory B. Pasquale, Esq. & Parshhueram T. Misa, Esq. re17 Scheduling Order. (PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/19 11:30 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter was recently reassigned to Magistrate Judge Adams. The status conference scheduled for 09/06/24 at 11:00 a.m. shall proceed as scheduled before Magistrate Judge Adams, except that it is converted into a video conference. Microsoft Teams login credentials shall be provided. No later than 3 days prior to the conference, the parties shall file a joint letter, no more than 3 pages in length: (1) providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims and defenses; (2) advising the Court of the status of discovery; (3) identifying any pending motions; and (4) advising the court whether there has been a previous settlement conference or mediation and, if not, whether one is desired. (Status Conference set for 9/6/2024 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 7/19/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
19 19 order Text Order Fri 07/12 4:11 PM
TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 9/6/24 at 11:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED. The Court will issue an Order rescheduling the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/12/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
18 18 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/09 11:25 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen no longer assigned to the case. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/07 12:14 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/6/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 06/06 4:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/6/2024. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
16 16 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 05/30 11:56 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC.(PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 04/19 11:40 AM
Plaintiff ANSWER to Counterclaim by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC.(PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
14 14 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/17 1:23 PM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 4/17/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 04/15 12:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NUCO PAINTING CORP. identifying Liberty Mutual Ins. Co. as Corporate Parent.. (MISIR, PARSHHUERAM)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 04/15 12:18 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff , COUNTERCLAIM of Nuco Painting Corp. against UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC by All Defendants.(MISIR, PARSHHUERAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by PARSHHUERAM MISIR on behalf of All Defendants (MISIR, PARSHHUERAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 5:05 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Thu 03/14 5:11 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendants Nuco Painting Corp and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 4/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/14/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 03/13 1:20 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,8 Affidavit of Service,7 Affidavit of Service Extending Time to Answer or Move to April 15, 2024 by All Defendants. (MISIR, PARSHHUERAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/07 2:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Manny Rendeiro, Registered Agent on 02/29/2024, filed by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC. (PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/27 3:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Brandon Brown, Managing Agent on 02/21/2024, filed by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC. (PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 02/13 9:42 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NUCO PAINTING CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 10, 2024
5 5 order Order Sat 02/10 4:07 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has properly alleged its citizenship (ECF No.4 ) in response to the Court's inquiry (ECF No. 3). The case will proceeding accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/10/2024. (bms)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 02/09 4:13 PM
DECLARATION OF CITIZENSHIP by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC. (PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Fri 02/09 1:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: In this diversity action, plaintiff is a limited liability company. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file by February 15, 2024 a declaration completely analyzing its citizenship with specificity in compliance with the Court's standing[LINK:order concerning unincorporated business organizations] and with 28 U.S.C. § 1332. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/9/2024. (bms)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/09 9:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 02/08 5:23 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC as to All Defendants.(PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Liberty Mutual Company Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/08 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15077098) with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNIQUE SCAFFOLDING SYSTEMS, LLC.(PASQUALE, GREGORY)
Related: [-]