Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:24-bk-01763
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2024

Debtor
Hard Core Bev, Inc. dba 2 Fools Cider
1864 High Grove Lane, Unit 100
Naperville, IL 60540
Represented By
Richard G Larsen
Springer Larsen Greene, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gina B Krol
Cohen & Krol 105 West Madison St Ste 1100
Chicago, IL 60602
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 12:03 AM CST
Thursday, February 08, 2024
1 1 57 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Thu 02/08 3:00 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Richard G Larsen on behalf of Hard Core Bev, Inc. dba 2 Fools Cider (Larsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/08 3:02 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-01763 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47503319. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Larsen, Richard) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Attachment (Do Not Use for Proposed Order) Thu 02/08 3:47 PM
Attachment(s) Signed Signature Page-Form 201 Filed by Richard G Larsen on behalf of Hard Core Bev, Inc. dba 2 Fools Cider Related [+]. (Larsen, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Thu 02/08 4:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/11/2024 at 11:00 AM at Zoom - Krol: Meeting ID 698 696 2818, Passcode 2115809013, Phone 1-872-282-6733. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]