New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00058
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 2:22 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ian Padmore (1)
Terminated: 02/08/2024


Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 3:17 AM EST
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION REQUEST as to Ian Padmore From Southern District of New York. Awaiting acceptance and signature. (RG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USPO Memorandum request for Transfer of Jurisdiction