Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:24-cr-00020
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 1:18 AM CST
Defendant
Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Joshua W. Weir
Weir Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mikala Purdy-Steenholdt
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2024
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE: This matter is before the Court on the Government's Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture, Filing 17. By virtue of the Defendant's plea of guilty and his admissions at the hearing before the Magistrate Judge on February 7, 2024, the Defendant has forfeited his interest in the $12,870 United States currency. The property is forfeited to the Government for disposition in accordance with the law. Upon adjudication of all third-party interests, this Court will enter a Final Order of Forfeiture as to Victor Javier Casillas Jr. (1). Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (ADB)
GPO Apr 09 2024
AMENDED ORDER ON SENTENCING SCHEDULE - Defendant's UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend PSI Objection Deadline regarding Order on Sentencing Schedule, 21 is granted as to Victor Javier Casillas Jr. Sentencing remains scheduled for May 8, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Omaha, Courtroom #5. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (TJM)
GPO Jun 05 2024
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE: The Government's Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture, Filing 30, is granted. All right, title and interest in and to the $12,820.00 seized from the Defendant on or about April 23, 2023, held by any person or entity are forever barred and foreclosed. The $12,820.00 in United States currency is forfeited to the Government. The Government is directed to dispose of that currency in accordance with the law as to Victor Javier Casillas Jr. (1). Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (ADB)
GPO Jun 05 2024
JUDGMENT as to Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. (1), Count 1 - Defendant pleaded guilty to count I of the Information and is committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of one hundred thirty (130) months; supervised release for a term of four (4) years; $100.00 special assessment as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (1 Certified copy to USM) (ADB)

Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 2:11 AM CST
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 TEXT ORDER SETTING CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING - Initial Appearance and Plea Hearing set for 2/7/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. At least seven (7) working days in advance of the plea proceeding above, counsel for plaintiff and for defendant shall email to the undersigned judge a copy of the following - (a) a copy of the Petition to Enter a Guilty Plea; (b) a copy of any Plea Agreement; and (c) a copy of any charging document not yet on file. The time between today's date and the date of the hearing is excluded under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A) & (B). The ends of justice outweigh the best interest of the public and defendant in a speedy trial, and the failure to grant a continuance would result in a miscarriage of justice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (E-mailed to USM, Probation/Pretrial, USA, and defense counsel) (KLF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
2 2 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum by Attorney Mikala Purdy-Steenholdt as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. (ADB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Victor Javier Casillas Jr. (1) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy provided to USA at the counter for agent)(ADB)
Related: [-]
4 4 WRIT (COPY) of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued as to Victor Casillas. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (copy provided to USA at counter for case agent) (ADB)
Related: [-]
6 6 INFORMATION as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. (ADB)
Related: [-]
7 7 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (ADB)
Related: [-]
8 8 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 2/7/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. Initial Appearance and Arraignment on the Information held. Defendant acknowledges receipt of a copy of the Information. Waiver of Indictment is accepted by the court. Government is given leave to file the Information. Plea Hearing held. Defendant's oral consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. Defendant pleads guilty as to Count I of the Information. Recommended that plea agreement be accepted at or before sentencing. Recommended that the plea be accepted at or before sentencing. Findings and Recommendation will be issued. Presentence Investigation and Report requested. Presentence Investigation Packet handed to Defendant's counsel. Sentencing set for 5/8/2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher. Detention hearing held. Government does not oppose the defendant's release on conditions. Defendant released on conditions. Hearing held in Omaha, NE. Appearance for Plaintiff: Mikala Purdy-Steenholdt, USA; Appearance for Defendant: Joshua W. Weir, Retained; Appearance by Pretrial: Brian Randall; Courtroom Deputy: Kristy Furey; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. No interpreter used during hearing. Time Start: 11:13 AM; Time Stop: 11:46 AM; Time in Court: 33 Minutes. (KLF)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER ON SENTENCING SCHEDULE - Sentencing set for 5/8/2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Brian C. Buescher as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
Related: [-]
10 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION ON PLEA OF GUILTY as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. It is recommended to District Judge Brian C. Buescher that, after de novo review, he accept the guilty plea and find the defendant guilty of the crime(s) to which the defendant tendered a guilty plea; and he accept any written plea agreement placed in the court file understanding that such acceptance is subject to the provisions of U.S.S.G. Section 6B1.4(d). ("The court is not bound by the stipulation, but may with the aid of the presentence report, determine the facts relevant to sentencing.") It is ordered that if any party desires to object to the findings and recommendation, they shall do so no later than 14 calendar days following the date of the findings and recommendation or they may be deemed to have waived the right to object to adoption of the findings and recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (E-mailed to USM) (KLF)
Related: [-]
12 12 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Victor Javier Casillas Jr.. Court Date & Time [ 2/7/2024 11:13:26 AM ]. File Size [ 8113 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:48 ]. (IA and Plea Hearing). (auto-docket).
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER of Indictment by Attorney Joshua W. Weir as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. (ADB)
Related: [-]
14 14 PETITION to enter plea of guilty as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. (ADB)
Related: [-]
15 15 PLEA AGREEMENT as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. (ADB)
Related: [-]
16 16 LETTER BY CLERK that a transcript request was sent to Brenda Fauber for transcription regarding Change of Plea Hearing 8 . Transcript ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis as to defendant Victor Javier Casillas, Jr.. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (ADB)
Related: [-]