New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00152
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 09, 2024 12:29 AM MST
Defendant
Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (1)
Represented By
Donald Jeffrey Morrison
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Virginia Silva
contact info
Laura Garibay
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Renee L Camacho
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jared Kirk Anthony Williams
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 1:31 AM MST
Sunday, August 27, 2023
Arrest of Gerardo Terrazas-Soledad (bw) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
Set Hearing as to Gerardo Terrazas-Soledad: Initial Appearance set for 8/29/2023 at 09:08 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (bw) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad. Attorney Renee L Camacho for USA added. (ch) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad. (nr) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Donald Jeffrey Morrison for Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (ch) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Initial Appearance as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad - True Name - held on 8/29/2023. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. USMS directed to address defendant's medical concern. Appearances: AUSA: Christopher McNair; AFPD: Andre Poissant; FPD Standing In; Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:14 AM - 9:25 AM. Time In Session: 9:14 AM - 9:25 AM. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea for 9/1/2023, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (ch) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (ch) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Silva, Virginia) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
6 6 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held on 9/1/2023 before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Preliminary/Detention Hearing CONTINUED as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad; Defendant to be interviewed by Pretrial Services, matter to be reset next week; Defendant in custody. (AUSA: Chris McNair; Defense: Don Morrison) Related [+] (Interpreter: Carolina Hickey) NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing RESET for 9/6/2023 at 9:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (kls) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca @ 9:25-9:26 a.m.
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Garibay, Laura) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
8 8 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad held on 9/6/2023. Detention Hearing continued for 9/8/2023 at 9:00am. Related [+] (Interpreter: Armida Hernandez) (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing/Grand Jury Presentment within 75 days for a total of 105 days pursuant to 18:3161 by Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad: Detention Hearing RESET for 9/8/2023 at 9:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (kls) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
13 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Detention Hearing as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad held on 9/8/2023 Related [+] (Interpreter: Armida Hernandez) (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad. Attorney Jared Kirk Anthony Williams for USA added. (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jared Kirk Anthony Williams appearing for USA. (Williams, Jared) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Continue Grand Jury Indictment by Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad. (Morrison, Donald) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
17 17 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE GRAND JURY PRESENTMENT by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad GRANTING16 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Continue Grand Jury Indictment filed by Gerardo Terrazas-Soledad. (cer) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
18 18 NOTICE of Intent to Enter Guilty Plea by Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (Morrison, Donald) [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad: Change of Plea Hearing set for 2/7/2024 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. [ Interpreter Needed ] (cfa) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:23-mj-01348-GJF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
20 20 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (1) count(s) 1, 2. (ch) Modified date on 2/8/2024 (ch).
Related: [-]
22 22 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (ch) Modified date on 2/8/2024 (ch).
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (ch)
Related: [-]
24 24 11 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (ch)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Plea Hearing as to Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad held on 2/7/2024, Plea entered by Gerardo Sebastian Terrazas-Soledad (1) Guilty Count 1,2. Related [+] (Interpreter: Carolina Hickey) (ch)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR Sierra Blanca