Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00020
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2024 11:44 PM PST
Defendant
Johnny R Blackstock (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick J Cashman
U S Attorney'S Office - Spo
contact info

GPO Jul 03 2024
ORDER GRANTING 34 DEFENDANT'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CONDITION NO. 11 as to Johnny R Blackstock (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (BM, Case Administrator)
GPO Oct 24 2024
JUDGMENT as to Johnny R Blackstock (1), Count(s) 1 - Dismissed; Count(s) 2 - Imprisonment: time served; Supervised Release: 3 years; Special Penalty Assessment: $100; Fine: waived. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (BM, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/24/2024 to correct name of signing Judge (BM, Case Administrator).

Docket last updated: 02/09/2024 12:50 AM PST
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Johnny R Blackstock (1) - Count 1-2. (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
3 3 Charges and Penalties as to Johnny R Blackstock (1). (LAS, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]